Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
filed a(n) Guardianship,Conservatorship - Probate case in the jurisdiction of Washoe County, NV, . Washoe County, NV Superior Courts with GORMAN, PROB. COMM. EDMUND J. presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeGORMAN, PROB. COMM. EDMUND J. Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMay 06, 2021 |
CategoryTn - Trust/Conservatorship |
Last RefreshedAugust 19, 2023 |
Practice AreaProbate |
Filing LocationWashoe County, NV |
Matter TypeGuardianship,Conservatorship |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 03, 2021 | Docket Event |
NEF - Proof of Electronic Service Transaction 8476653 - Approved By: NOREVIEW : 06-03-2021:10:49:13 |
|
June 03, 2021 | Docket Event |
2540 - Notice of Entry of Ord Transaction 8476647 - Approved By: NOREVIEW : 06-03-2021:10:46:19 |
|
May 27, 2021 | Docket Event |
3357 - Ord upon Petition ORDER CONFIRMING PROPERTY AS TRUST ASSET - Transaction 8467507 - Approved By: NOREVIEW : 05-27-2021:13:22:55 |
|
May 27, 2021 | Docket Event |
F140 - Adj Summary Judgment Extra Text: |
|
May 27, 2021 | Docket Event |
NEF - Proof of Electronic Service Transaction 8467517 - Approved By: NOREVIEW : 05-27-2021:13:25:54 |
|
May 26, 2021 | Docket Event |
MIN - ***Minutes 5/26/2021: Petition to confirm Property as Asset pursuant to NRS 163.001 (1)(A)(1). - Transaction 8465785 - Approved By: NOREVIEW : 05-26-2021:15:30:37 |
|
May 26, 2021 | Docket Event |
NEF - Proof of Electronic Service Transaction 8465792 - Approved By: NOREVIEW : 05-26-2021:15:31:44 |
|
May 26, 2021 | Hearing |
HP26 - OTHER PROB/TRST/GDSHP HRG D425 - Granted filed on: 05/26/2021 Extra Text: JAVS/ZOOM/L.SCURLOCK 5/26/2021: Petition to confirm Property as Asset pursuant to NRS 163.001 (1)(A)(1). Judge: PROB. COMM. GORMAN |
|
May 26, 2021 | Hearing |
HP26 - OTHER PROB/TRST/GDSHP HRG - filed on: Extra Text: Judge: PROB. COMM. GORMAN |
|
May 07, 2021 | Docket Event |
NEF - Proof of Electronic Service Transaction 8433895 - Approved By: NOREVIEW : 05-07-2021:13:05:38 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.