Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
filed a(n) Estate Administration - Probate case in the jurisdiction of Washoe County, NV, . Washoe County, NV Superior Courts with GORMAN, PROB. COMM. EDMUND J. presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeGORMAN, PROB. COMM. EDMUND J. Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMay 05, 2021 |
CategorySu - Summary Administration |
Last RefreshedSeptember 21, 2022 |
Practice AreaProbate |
Filing LocationWashoe County, NV |
Matter TypeEstate Administration |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 21, 2022 | Hearing |
HP25 - REPORT TO COURT D425 - Granted filed on: 09/21/2022 Extra Text: JAVS/ZOOM/COURTROOM B/RBRANUM 9/21/2022: Report to the Court and First Accounting Judge: PROB. COMM. GORMAN |
|
September 21, 2022 | Docket Event |
NEF - Proof of Electronic Service Transaction 9271899 - Approved By: NOREVIEW : 09-21-2022:12:26:40 |
|
September 21, 2022 | Docket Event |
MIN - ***Minutes 9/21/2022: Report to the Court and First Accounting - Transaction 9271897 - Approved By: NOREVIEW : 09-21-2022:12:25:50 |
|
September 01, 2022 | Docket Event |
1356 - Certificate of Mailing Transaction 9238837 - Approved By: NOREVIEW : 09-01-2022:13:44:23 |
|
September 01, 2022 | Docket Event |
NEF - Proof of Electronic Service Transaction 9238828 - Approved By: NOREVIEW : 09-01-2022:13:38:08 |
|
September 01, 2022 | Docket Event |
2550 - Notice of Hearing SEPTEMBER 21, 2022 @ 10:00AM - Transaction 9238824 - Approved By: NOREVIEW : 09-01-2022:13:37:13 |
|
September 01, 2022 | Docket Event |
NEF - Proof of Electronic Service Transaction 9238840 - Approved By: NOREVIEW : 09-01-2022:13:44:54 |
|
August 31, 2022 | Docket Event |
3830 - Report to Court - NRS 143.035 Transaction 9236157 - Approved By: NOREVIEW : 08-31-2022:12:39:59 |
|
August 31, 2022 | Docket Event |
NEF - Proof of Electronic Service Transaction 9236162 - Approved By: NOREVIEW : 08-31-2022:12:40:38 |
|
July 28, 2022 | Docket Event |
NEF - Proof of Electronic Service Transaction 9174544 - Approved By: NOREVIEW : 07-28-2022:10:01:42 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.