Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
filed a(n) Guardianship,Conservatorship - Probate case in the jurisdiction of Washoe County, NV, . Washoe County, NV Superior Courts with Tamatha R. Schreinert presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeTamatha R. Schreinert Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateSeptember 07, 2021 |
CategoryGb - Guardianship Of A Minor |
Last RefreshedAugust 19, 2023 |
Practice AreaProbate |
Filing LocationWashoe County, NV |
Matter TypeGuardianship,Conservatorship |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 19, 2022 | Docket Event |
2777 - Ord Approving ... ORDER APPROVING ANNUAL REPORT - Transaction 9320029 - Approved By: NOREVIEW : 10-19-2022:10:56:20 |
|
October 19, 2022 | Docket Event |
NEF - Proof of Electronic Service Transaction 9320030 - Approved By: NOREVIEW : 10-19-2022:10:56:49 |
|
October 13, 2022 | Docket Event |
NEF - Proof of Electronic Service Transaction 9311309 - Approved By: NOREVIEW : 10-13-2022:14:43:08 |
|
October 13, 2022 | Docket Event |
3860 - Request for Submission Transaction 9311304 - Approved By: NOREVIEW : 10-13-2022:14:42:28 DOCUMENT TITLE: CONFIDENTIAL MEDICAL/EDUCATIONAL DOCUMENTS FILED 9/29/2022 PARTY SUBMITTING: MARILYN YORK, ESQ DATE SUBMITTED: 10/13/2022 SUBMITTED BY: CS DATE RECEIVED JUDGE OFFICE: |
|
October 13, 2022 | Hearing |
S1 - Request for Submission S200 - Request for Submission Complet filed on: 10/19/2022 Extra Text: Judge: TAMATHA SCHREINERT |
|
September 29, 2022 | Docket Event |
3860 - Request for Submission Transaction 9287716 - Approved By: NOREVIEW : 09-29-2022:15:37:44 DOCUMENT TITLE: ANNUAL REPORT OF GUARDIAN OF A MINOR PARTY SUBMITTING: MARILYN YORK, ESQ. DATE SUBMITTED: 9/29/2022 SUBMITTED BY: CS DATE RECEIVED JUDGE OFFICE: |
|
September 29, 2022 | Docket Event |
1457 - Confidential Document(s) Medical/Educational - Transaction 9287445 - Approved By: NOREVIEW : 09-29-2022:14:48:48 |
|
September 29, 2022 | Docket Event |
NEF - Proof of Electronic Service Transaction 9287449 - Approved By: NOREVIEW : 09-29-2022:14:49:25 |
|
September 29, 2022 | Docket Event |
NEF - Proof of Electronic Service Transaction 9287724 - Approved By: NOREVIEW : 09-29-2022:15:38:28 |
|
September 29, 2022 | Docket Event |
1125 - Annual Report of Guardian Transaction 9287132 - Approved By: NOREVIEW : 09-29-2022:13:55:43 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.