Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
filed a(n) Guardianship,Conservatorship - Probate case in the jurisdiction of Washoe County, NV, . Washoe County, NV Superior Courts with Tamatha R. Schreinert presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeTamatha R. Schreinert Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateAugust 16, 2021 |
CategoryGb - Guardianship Of A Minor |
Last RefreshedAugust 19, 2023 |
Practice AreaProbate |
Filing LocationWashoe County, NV |
Matter TypeGuardianship,Conservatorship |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 22, 2021 | Docket Event |
MDR - **Mail Desk Return Notes DOCUMENT: ORDER FOR DISMISSAL OF PETITION TO APPOINT GUARDIAN WITHOUT PREJUDICE DATE FILED: 9.30.21 ADDRESSEE: CHRISTOPHER SIMMONS #2109257, C/O WASHOE COUNTY DETENTION CENTER, 911 PARR BLVD, RENO, NV 89502 RETURN REASON: RETURN TO SENDER/NOT DELIVERABLE AS ADDRESSED/UNABLE TO FORWARD |
|
October 21, 2021 | Docket Event |
MDR - **Mail Desk Return Notes DOCUMENT: ORDER FOR DISMISSAL OF PETITION TO APPOINT GUARDIAN WITHOUT PREJUDICE DATE FILED: 9.30.21 ADDRESSEE: CHRISTOPHER SIMMONS #2109257, C/O WASHOE COUNTY DETENTION CENTER/911 PARR BLVD., RENO, NEVADA 89512 RETURN REASON: RETURN TO SENDER/NOT DELIVERABLE AS ADDRESSED/UNABLE TO FORWARD |
|
September 30, 2021 | Docket Event |
2920 - Ord for Dismissal... Transaction 8675436 - Approved By: NOREVIEW : 09-30-2021:14:40:44 |
|
September 30, 2021 | Docket Event |
F235 - Voluntary Dismissal Extra Text: |
|
September 30, 2021 | Docket Event |
NEF - Proof of Electronic Service Transaction 8675429 - Approved By: NOREVIEW : 09-30-2021:14:38:47 |
|
September 30, 2021 | Hearing |
HP7 - PET/APPT/GDN/MINOR D647 - Petition Dismissed filed on: 09/30/2021 Extra Text: NMILTON/C4/SUNSHINE LITIGATION - BRANDI SMITH Judge: TAMATHA SCHREINERT |
|
September 30, 2021 | Docket Event |
NEF - Proof of Electronic Service Transaction 8675442 - Approved By: NOREVIEW : 09-30-2021:14:41:45 |
|
September 30, 2021 | Docket Event |
MIN - ***Minutes 9-30-21 GUARD - Transaction 8675425 - Approved By: NOREVIEW : 09-30-2021:14:37:29 |
|
September 30, 2021 | Hearing |
HP7 - PET/APPT/GDN/MINOR - filed on: Extra Text: Judge: TAMATHA SCHREINERT |
|
August 27, 2021 | Docket Event |
NEF - Proof of Electronic Service Transaction 8619280 - Approved By: NOREVIEW : 08-27-2021:20:27:26 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.