Case Last Refreshed: 3 weeks ago
filed a(n) Guardianship,Conservatorship - Probate case in the jurisdiction of Washoe County, NV, . Washoe County, NV Superior Courts with Tamatha R. Schreinert presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeTamatha R. Schreinert Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJune 03, 2021 |
CategoryGb - Guardianship Of A Minor |
Last RefreshedMarch 07, 2024 |
Practice AreaProbate |
Filing LocationWashoe County, NV |
Matter TypeGuardianship,Conservatorship |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 05, 2024 | Docket Event |
NEF - Proof of Electronic Service Transaction 10198676 - Approved By: NOREVIEW : 03-05-2024:13:15:47 Judge: TAMATHA SCHREINERT |
|
March 05, 2024 | Docket Event |
1638 - Drug/Alcohol Screen Results CONFIDENTIAL DRUG SCREEN RESULTS - ALBERTO BERNAL - DATED: 2.29.24 - Transaction 10198666 - Approved By: NOREVIEW : 03-05-2024:13:14:51 Judge: TAMATHA SCHREINERT |
|
February 29, 2024 | Docket Event |
NEF - Proof of Electronic Service Transaction 10189368 - Approved By: NOREVIEW : 02-29-2024:11:29:05 Judge: TAMATHA SCHREINERT |
|
February 29, 2024 | Docket Event |
1638 - Drug/Alcohol Screen Results CONFIDENTIAL DRUG SCREEN RESULTS - ALBERTO BERNAL - DATED: 2.23.24 - Transaction 10189363 - Approved By: NOREVIEW : 02-29-2024:11:28:16 Judge: TAMATHA SCHREINERT |
|
February 22, 2024 | Docket Event |
NEF - Proof of Electronic Service Transaction 10173579 - Approved By: NOREVIEW : 02-22-2024:09:13:15 Judge: TAMATHA SCHREINERT |
|
February 22, 2024 | Docket Event |
1638 - Drug/Alcohol Screen Results CONFIDENTIAL DRUG SCREEN RESULTS - ALBERTO BERNAL - DATED: 2.13.24 - Transaction 10173573 - Approved By: NOREVIEW : 02-22-2024:09:12:26 Judge: TAMATHA SCHREINERT |
|
February 09, 2024 | Docket Event |
1638 - Drug/Alcohol Screen Results CONFIDENTIAL DRUG SCREEN RESULTS - ALBERTO BERNAL - DATED: 2.8.24 - Transaction 10151704 - Approved By: NOREVIEW : 02-09-2024:12:54:04 Judge: TAMATHA SCHREINERT |
|
February 09, 2024 | Docket Event |
NEF - Proof of Electronic Service Transaction 10151720 - Approved By: NOREVIEW : 02-09-2024:12:55:01 Judge: TAMATHA SCHREINERT |
|
February 02, 2024 | Docket Event |
1638 - Drug/Alcohol Screen Results CONFIDENTIAL DRUG SCREEN RESULTS - ALBERTO BERNAL - DATED: 2.1.24 - Transaction 10138009 - Approved By: NOREVIEW : 02-02-2024:13:39:49 Judge: TAMATHA SCHREINERT |
|
February 02, 2024 | Docket Event |
NEF - Proof of Electronic Service Transaction 10138018 - Approved By: NOREVIEW : 02-02-2024:13:41:21 Judge: TAMATHA SCHREINERT |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.