Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
filed a(n) Child Support - Family case in the jurisdiction of Washoe County, NV, . Washoe County, NV Superior Courts with MASTER SHANNON presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeMASTER SHANNON Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateAugust 12, 2021 |
CategoryUf - Intrastate (Title Iv-D) |
Last RefreshedOctober 26, 2023 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationWashoe County, NV |
Matter TypeChild Support |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 26, 2023 | Docket Event |
H476 - MOTION TO MODIFY - filed on: Extra Text: Judge: MASTER SHANNON |
|
November 17, 2021 | Hearing |
H476 - MOTION TO MODIFY - filed on: Extra Text: Judge: MASTER SHANNON |
|
November 10, 2021 | Docket Event |
2610 - Notice ... OF PROPOSED EXHIBITS - Transaction 8742773 - Approved By: MSALAZAR : 11-10-2021:09:38:50 |
|
November 10, 2021 | Docket Event |
NEF - Proof of Electronic Service Transaction 8742985 - Approved By: NOREVIEW : 11-10-2021:09:42:52 |
|
November 10, 2021 | Docket Event |
2610 - Notice ... OF PROPOSED EXHIBTS - Transaction 8743476 - Approved By: MSALAZAR : 11-10-2021:11:33:22 |
|
November 10, 2021 | Docket Event |
NEF - Proof of Electronic Service Transaction 8743505 - Approved By: NOREVIEW : 11-10-2021:11:34:55 |
|
September 30, 2021 | Docket Event |
1945 - Master's Recommendation/Ord MASTERS FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS; NOTICE OF ENTRY OF ORDER - Transaction 8673706 - Approved By: NOREVIEW : 09-30-2021:07:39:05 |
|
September 30, 2021 | Docket Event |
NEF - Proof of Electronic Service Transaction 8673717 - Approved By: NOREVIEW : 09-30-2021:07:40:27 |
|
September 30, 2021 | Docket Event |
F255 - Setld/Withdrn with Jud Conf/Hg Extra Text: |
|
September 15, 2021 | Docket Event |
1940 - Master's Findings/Recommend MASTERS FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS - Transaction 8647839 - Approved By: NOREVIEW : 09-15-2021:13:39:50 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.