Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case in the jurisdiction of Washoe County, NV, . Washoe County, NV Superior Courts with Aimee E. Banales presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeAimee E. Banales Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateApril 30, 2021 |
CategoryCu - Custody (Non-Divorce) |
Last RefreshedSeptember 26, 2023 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationWashoe County, NV |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 26, 2023 | Hearing |
H644 - ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE D435 - Heard ... filed on: 09/26/2023 Extra Text: JAVS. DEPARTMENT 16. R. WILDING, CLERK.. D16. CLERK TO PREPARE OAH. Judge: AIMEE BANALES |
|
September 05, 2023 | Docket Event |
NEF - Proof of Electronic Service Transaction 9868620 - Approved By: NOREVIEW : 09-05-2023:14:51:07 |
|
September 05, 2023 | Docket Event |
3175 - Ord Re: Hearing Procedure September 26, 2023 at 9:00 a.m. - Transaction 9868618 - Approved By: NOREVIEW : 09-05-2023:14:50:26 |
|
July 27, 2023 | Docket Event |
3242 - Ord Setting Hearing September 26, 2023 at 9:00 a.m. - Transaction 9799763 - Approved By: NOREVIEW : 07-27-2023:20:58:06 |
|
July 27, 2023 | Docket Event |
NEF - Proof of Electronic Service Transaction 9799764 - Approved By: NOREVIEW : 07-27-2023:20:58:36 |
|
July 17, 2023 | Docket Event |
3720 - Proof of Service IVY ARZATE 07-17-2023 VIA EFLEX - Transaction 9777016 - Approved By: NOREVIEW : 07-17-2023:11:18:09 |
|
July 17, 2023 | Docket Event |
3860 - Request for Submission DFX: NO SUCH DOCUMENT FILED TODAY Transaction 9777016 - Approved By: NOREVIEW : 07-17-2023:11:18:09 DOCUMENT TITLE: REQUEST FOR HEARING PARTY SUBMITTING: M. HERRERA DATE SUBMITTED: 07/17/2023 SUBMITTED BY: SJA DATE RECEIVED JUDGE OFFICE: |
|
July 17, 2023 | Docket Event |
2610 - Notice ... Transaction 9777016 - Approved By: NOREVIEW : 07-17-2023:11:18:09 |
|
July 17, 2023 | Docket Event |
NEF - Proof of Electronic Service Transaction 9777026 - Approved By: NOREVIEW : 07-17-2023:11:19:35 |
|
July 17, 2023 | Hearing |
S1 - Request for Submission S200 - Request for Submission Complet filed on: 07/27/2023 Extra Text: Judge: AIMEE BANALES |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.