We are checking for the latest updates in this case. We will email you when the process is complete.

Las Vegas Metropolitan Police Department, Plaintiff(S) Vs. U.S. Currency $22,300.00, Defendant(S)

Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago

Las Vegas Metropolitan Police Department, filed a(n) Other Civil Matters case represented by Scott Greenberg, Esq, against U.S. Currency $22,300.00, in the jurisdiction of Clark County, NV, . Clark County, NV Superior Courts .

Case Details for Las Vegas Metropolitan Police Department v. U.S. Currency $22,300.00

Filing Date

June 30, 2023

Category

Other Civil Matters

Last Refreshed

July 01, 2023

Filing Location

Clark County, NV

Parties for Las Vegas Metropolitan Police Department v. U.S. Currency $22,300.00

Plaintiffs

Las Vegas Metropolitan Police Department

Attorneys for Plaintiffs

Scott Greenberg, Esq

Defendants

U.S. Currency $22,300.00

Case Events for Las Vegas Metropolitan Police Department v. U.S. Currency $22,300.00

Type Description
Docket Event Complaint Doc ID# 1
[1] Complaint for Forfeiture
See all events

Related Content in Clark County

Case

Kunisha Johnson, Plaintiff(s) vs. Savannah Hinojosa, Defendant(s)
Jul 09, 2024 | Yeager, Bita | Negligence - Auto | A-24-897024-C

Case

LVNV Funding LLC, Plaintiff(s) vs. Alexandria Brooks, Defendant(s)
Jul 09, 2024 | Reynolds, Jacob A. | Collection of Accounts | A-24-897030-C

Case

Republic Silver State Disposal, Inc., Plaintiff(s) vs. Natashia Houser, Defendant(s)
Jul 12, 2024 | Reynolds, Jacob A. | Other Title to Property | A-24-897338-C

Case

JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A., Plaintiff(s) vs. Eric Mitchell, Defendant(s)
Jul 08, 2024 | Reynolds, Jacob A. | Collection of Accounts | A-24-896937-C

Case

In the Matter of the Petition for Compromise of Minor's Claim by Maria De La Luz Ortega Zamora
May 05, 2023 | Gall, Maria | Compromise of Minor's Claim | A-23-870231-M

Case

Bianca Fleming, Plaintiff(s) vs. Circus Circus Casinos, Inc., Defendant(s)
Jul 11, 2024 | Kishner, Joanna S. | Negligence - Premises Liability | A-24-897313-C

Case

Velocity Investments LLC, Plaintiff(s) vs. Kevin Peschke, Defendant(s)
Jul 08, 2024 | Kierny, Carli | Collection of Accounts | A-24-896988-C

Case

Gabriel Amar, Plaintiff(s) vs. George Baca, Defendant(s)
Jul 10, 2024 | Reynolds, Jacob A. | Negligence - Premises Liability | A-24-897137-C

Case

Lea Glenn, Plaintiff(s) vs. Michael Harris, Defendant(s)
Jul 10, 2024 | Hardy, Joe | Negligence - Auto | A-24-897108-C

Case

In the Matter of the Petition of Adam Vincent Levy
Jan 10, 2023 | Albertson, Anna | Petition to Seal Records | A-23-863770-S

Case

Chadaporn Oo-Sub, Plaintiff(s) vs. Jules Masiclat, Defendant(s)
Jul 08, 2024 | Lilly-Spells, Jasmin | Negligence - Auto | A-24-896953-C

Case

LVNV Funding LLC, Plaintiff(s) vs. Cheryl Waldrop, Defendant(s)
Dec 28, 2022 | Albertson, Anna | Other Civil Matters | A-22-863155-C

Case

Shakirullah Safi, Plaintiff(s) vs. Darrian Jones, Defendant(s)
Jul 09, 2024 | Albertson, Anna | Negligence - Auto | A-24-897053-C

Document

Gaspar Haro, Plaintiff(s) vs. Tides Equities, Defendant(s)
Jul 08, 2024 | Schwartz, Jennifer | Negligence - Premises Liability | A-24-896982-C

Document

Joyce De Leon vs Bill Heard Chevrolet Corp - Las Vegas
Feb 24, 2006 | Kishner, Joanna S. | Breach of Contract | 06A517954

Document

Gary Dunson, Plaintiff(s) vs. Mary Murray, Defendant(s)
Jul 10, 2024 | Williams, Timothy C. | Negligence - Auto | A-24-897156-C

Document

National Default Servicing Corporation, Plaintiff(s) vs. Farr Family Trust, Defendant(s)
Aug 07, 2023 | Albertson, Anna | Other Civil Matters | A-23-875426-C

Document

In the Matter of the Petition of Patrick Michael Warner
Mar 30, 2023 | Wiese, Jerry A. | Criminal Petition | C-23-372767-P

Document

In the Matter of the Petition of DeAndre Kerone Lenier Sims
Apr 10, 2024 | Sturman, Gloria | Petition to Seal Records | A-24-890899-S

Document

Sharon Pignataro, Plaintiff(s) vs. Steven Moss, Defendant(s)
Aug 10, 2023 | Pieper, Danielle | Negligence - Auto | A-23-875671-C

Document

Edgar Rizarri, Plaintiff(s) vs. Arturo Hernandez-Rodriguez, Defendant(s)
Jan 25, 2021 | Lilly-Spells, Jasmin | Negligence - Auto | A-21-828340-C