We are checking for the latest updates in this case. We will email you when the process is complete.

Sheila Cornyn, Plaintiff(S) Vs. Philip Delaune, Defendant(S)

Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago

Cornyn, Sheila, filed a(n) Other Civil Matters case represented by Pro Se, against Delaune, Philip Charles, in the jurisdiction of Clark County, NV, . Clark County, NV Superior Courts .

Case Details for Cornyn, Sheila v. Delaune, Philip Charles

Filing Date

June 10, 2023

Category

Other Civil Matters

Last Refreshed

June 11, 2023

Filing Location

Clark County, NV

Parties for Cornyn, Sheila v. Delaune, Philip Charles

Plaintiffs

Cornyn, Sheila

Attorneys for Plaintiffs

Pro Se

Defendants

Delaune, Philip Charles

Case Events for Cornyn, Sheila v. Delaune, Philip Charles

Type Description
Docket Event Motion for Protective Order Doc ID# 1
[1] Order of protection from Philip Delaune
See all events

Related Content in Clark County

Case

Kunisha Johnson, Plaintiff(s) vs. Savannah Hinojosa, Defendant(s)
Jul 09, 2024 | Yeager, Bita | Negligence - Auto | A-24-897024-C

Case

LVNV Funding LLC, Plaintiff(s) vs. Alexandria Brooks, Defendant(s)
Jul 09, 2024 | Reynolds, Jacob A. | Collection of Accounts | A-24-897030-C

Case

Republic Silver State Disposal, Inc., Plaintiff(s) vs. Natashia Houser, Defendant(s)
Jul 12, 2024 | Reynolds, Jacob A. | Other Title to Property | A-24-897338-C

Case

JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A., Plaintiff(s) vs. Eric Mitchell, Defendant(s)
Jul 08, 2024 | Reynolds, Jacob A. | Collection of Accounts | A-24-896937-C

Case

In the Matter of the Petition for Compromise of Minor's Claim by Maria De La Luz Ortega Zamora
May 05, 2023 | Gall, Maria | Compromise of Minor's Claim | A-23-870231-M

Case

Bianca Fleming, Plaintiff(s) vs. Circus Circus Casinos, Inc., Defendant(s)
Jul 11, 2024 | Kishner, Joanna S. | Negligence - Premises Liability | A-24-897313-C

Case

Velocity Investments LLC, Plaintiff(s) vs. Kevin Peschke, Defendant(s)
Jul 08, 2024 | Kierny, Carli | Collection of Accounts | A-24-896988-C

Case

Gabriel Amar, Plaintiff(s) vs. George Baca, Defendant(s)
Jul 10, 2024 | Reynolds, Jacob A. | Negligence - Premises Liability | A-24-897137-C

Case

Lea Glenn, Plaintiff(s) vs. Michael Harris, Defendant(s)
Jul 10, 2024 | Hardy, Joe | Negligence - Auto | A-24-897108-C

Case

In the Matter of the Petition of Adam Vincent Levy
Jan 10, 2023 | Albertson, Anna | Petition to Seal Records | A-23-863770-S

Case

Chadaporn Oo-Sub, Plaintiff(s) vs. Jules Masiclat, Defendant(s)
Jul 08, 2024 | Lilly-Spells, Jasmin | Negligence - Auto | A-24-896953-C

Case

LVNV Funding LLC, Plaintiff(s) vs. Cheryl Waldrop, Defendant(s)
Dec 28, 2022 | Albertson, Anna | Other Civil Matters | A-22-863155-C

Case

Shakirullah Safi, Plaintiff(s) vs. Darrian Jones, Defendant(s)
Jul 09, 2024 | Albertson, Anna | Negligence - Auto | A-24-897053-C

Document

Gaspar Haro, Plaintiff(s) vs. Tides Equities, Defendant(s)
Jul 08, 2024 | Schwartz, Jennifer | Negligence - Premises Liability | A-24-896982-C

Document

Joyce De Leon vs Bill Heard Chevrolet Corp - Las Vegas
Feb 24, 2006 | Kishner, Joanna S. | Breach of Contract | 06A517954

Document

Gary Dunson, Plaintiff(s) vs. Mary Murray, Defendant(s)
Jul 10, 2024 | Williams, Timothy C. | Negligence - Auto | A-24-897156-C

Document

National Default Servicing Corporation, Plaintiff(s) vs. Farr Family Trust, Defendant(s)
Aug 07, 2023 | Albertson, Anna | Other Civil Matters | A-23-875426-C

Document

In the Matter of the Petition of Patrick Michael Warner
Mar 30, 2023 | Wiese, Jerry A. | Criminal Petition | C-23-372767-P

Document

In the Matter of the Petition of DeAndre Kerone Lenier Sims
Apr 10, 2024 | Sturman, Gloria | Petition to Seal Records | A-24-890899-S

Document

Sharon Pignataro, Plaintiff(s) vs. Steven Moss, Defendant(s)
Aug 10, 2023 | Pieper, Danielle | Negligence - Auto | A-23-875671-C

Document

Edgar Rizarri, Plaintiff(s) vs. Arturo Hernandez-Rodriguez, Defendant(s)
Jan 25, 2021 | Lilly-Spells, Jasmin | Negligence - Auto | A-21-828340-C