Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
filed a(n) General Insurance - Insurance case in the jurisdiction of Clark County, NV, . Clark County, NV Superior Courts with Denton, Mark R. presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeDenton, Mark R. Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJune 06, 2022 |
CategoryInsurance Tort |
Last RefreshedNovember 04, 2022 |
Practice AreaInsurance |
Filing LocationClark County, NV |
Matter TypeGeneral Insurance |
Case Outcome TypeOrder Of Dismissal Without Prejudice |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 03, 2022 | Docket Event |
Motion to Strike Vacated Judge: Denton, Mark R. |
|
November 03, 2022 | Docket Event |
Motion to Dismiss Amended Complaint
Judge: Denton, Mark R. |
|
November 03, 2022 | Docket Event |
Motion to Strike Fourth Motion to Strike Judge: Denton, Mark R. |
|
October 17, 2022 | Docket Event |
Minute Order HAVING further reviewed and considered the parties filings regarding the items referenced hereinbelow, deemed submitted and taken under advisement on October 13, 2022, the Court makes the following determinations and rulings: Plaintiff James Sharkey s Motion to Amend Complaint : The Court is persuaded by the Opposition and determines that the Motion is without merit and thus DENIES the same. Defendant s Motion to Re-Declare James Sharkey a Vexatious Litigant : In that the Motion is seeking a District-wide vexatious litigant determination, and in that this Department of the Court has been informed that the policy of the Eighth Judicial District Court is that the Chief Judge makes those determinations, the Court DENIES the subject Motion without prejudice to proceedings brought by Defendant before the Chief Judge and will make whatever transfer or referral of this case to the Chief Judge for such purpose as is deemed necessary and appropriate. In addition, and noting that there has been no timely written opposition to Defendant s Fourth Motion to Strike, filed and served by mail on September 26, 2022 and calendared for hearing on November 3, 2022, the Court deems the same submitted and GRANTS such Motion and vacates it from its calendar of November 3, 2022. EDCR 2.23. Counsel for Defendant is directed to submit a proposed order(s) consistent herewith and with supportive briefing. IT IS SO ORDERED. CLERK'S NOTE: The above minute order has been distributed to all registered parties via Odyssey File & Serve. //ma 10/17/22 Judge: Denton, Mark R. |
|
October 13, 2022 | Docket Event |
All Pending Motions DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO RE-DECLARE JAMES SHARKEY A VEXATIOUS LITIGANT . . . MOTION TO AMEND COMPLAINT Counsel present via BlueJeans. COURT NOTED having read the filings. Colloquy regarding clarification on seeking Mr. Sharkey to be declared as a vexatious litigant in the Eighth Judicial District Court. Ms. Wise noted that Judge Villani deemed Mr. Sharkey a vexatious litigant. Colloquy regarding competing Amended Complaints filed and Motion to Strike. COURT ORDERED, Defendant's Motion to Re-Declare James Sharkey a Vexatious Litigant and Plaintiffs' Motion to Amend Complaint STAND SUBMITTED; and the Court will ISSUE its rulings. Judge: Denton, Mark R. |
|
October 13, 2022 | Docket Event |
All Pending Motions
Judge: Denton, Mark R. |
|
October 05, 2022 | Docket Event |
Notice of Intent Doc ID# 92 [92] Notice of Intent to Appear Simultaneously by Bluejeans or telephonic Communication Equipment |
|
September 28, 2022 | Docket Event |
Clerk's Notice of Hearing Doc ID# 91 [91] Clerk's Notice of Hearing |
|
September 27, 2022 | Docket Event |
Opposition to Motion to Dismiss Doc ID# 90 [90] Opposition to Motion to Dismiss Amended Complaint |
|
September 27, 2022 | Docket Event |
Motion to Dismiss Doc ID# 89 [89] Motion to Dismiss Amended Complaint |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.