Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Rh Kids, Llc, filed a(n) Other Title To Property case represented by Ariel E. Stern, Joseph Y. Hong, against Quality Loan Service Corporation, The Bank Of New York Mellon, represented by Ariel E. Stern, in the jurisdiction of Clark County, NV, . Clark County, NV Superior Courts with Wiese, Jerry presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeWiese, Jerry Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMay 24, 2022 |
CategoryOther Title To Property |
Last RefreshedOctober 05, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationClark County, NV |
|
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 03, 2023 | Docket Event |
Motion to Amend Plaintiff, RH Kids, LLC's, Motion To Alter/Amend The Order Granting Defendant's Renewed Motion To Dismiss All Claims, Dissolve Preliminary Injunction, Expunge Lis Pendens, And Alternatively, For Summary Judgment On Plaintiff's Sixth Claim For Relief Judge: Chio, Danielle |
|
September 26, 2023 | Docket Event |
Reply in Support Doc ID# 53 [53] Plaintiff, RH Kids, LLC's, Reply In Support Of Motion To Alter/Amend The Order Granting Defendant's Renewed Motion To Dismiss All Claims, Dissolve Preliminary Injunction, Expunge Lis Pendens, And Alternatively, For Summary Judgment On Plaintiff's Sixth Claim For Relief |
|
September 21, 2023 | Docket Event |
Order Doc ID# 51 [51] Order Taxing Costs |
|
September 21, 2023 | Docket Event |
Notice of Entry of Order Doc ID# 52 [52] Notice of Entry of Order Taxing Costs |
|
September 18, 2023 | Docket Event |
Opposition to Motion Doc ID# 50 [50] Opposition to Motion to Alter/Amend |
|
September 01, 2023 | Docket Event |
Clerk's Notice of Hearing Doc ID# 49 [49] Notice of Hearing |
|
August 31, 2023 | Docket Event |
Motion to Amend Doc ID# 48 [48] Plaintiff, RH Kids, LLC's, Motion To Alter/Amend The Order Granting Defendant's Renewed Motion To Dismiss All Claims, Dissolve Preliminary Injunction, Expunge Lis Pendens, And Alternatively, For Summary Judgment On Plaintiff's Sixth Claim For Relief |
|
August 04, 2023 | Docket Event |
Memorandum of Costs and Disbursements Doc ID# 47 [47] The Bank of New York Mellon fka The Bank of New York, as Trustee for the Certificateholders of CWALT, Inc. Alternative Loan Trust 2005-65CB, Mortgage Pass-Through, Certificates, Series 2005-65CB's Memorandum of Costs |
|
August 03, 2023 | Docket Event |
Order Granting Motion Doc ID# 45 [45] Order Granting Defendant's Renewed Motion to Dismiss All Claims, Dissolve Preliminary Injunction, Expunge Lis Pendens, and Alternatively For Summary Judgment on Plaintiff's Sixth Claim for Relief |
|
August 03, 2023 | Docket Event |
Notice of Entry of Order Doc ID# 46 [46] Notice of Entry of Order Granting Defendant's Renewed Motion to Dismiss All Claims, Dissolve Preliminary Injunction, Expunge Lis Pendens, and, Alternatively, for Summary Judgment on Plaintiff's Sixth Claim for Relief |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.