Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
filed a(n) Compromise Of Minor'S Claim case in the jurisdiction of Clark County, NV, . Clark County, NV Superior Courts with Israel, Ronald J. presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeIsrael, Ronald J. Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMay 20, 2022 |
CategoryCompromise Of Minor'S Claim |
Last RefreshedAugust 12, 2022 |
|
Filing LocationClark County, NV |
|
Case Outcome TypeOrder Approving Minor'S Compromise |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 05, 2022 | Docket Event |
Order to Statistically Close Case Doc ID# 5 [5] Civil Order to Statistically Close Case |
|
July 28, 2022 | Docket Event |
Status Check: Blocked Account Petitioner filed Proof of Establishment of Blocked Trust Account on July 6, 2022. Yet, the Proof was insufficient due to the entire account number being redacted. Subsequently, Petitioner filed Proof of Establishment of Blocked Trust Account on July 15, 2022. Upon review, the Court finds that the Proof is sufficient and HEREBY ORDERS the case closed. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Proof of Establishment of Blocked Trust Account filed on July 6, 2022, is hereby stricken. CLERK'S NOTE: This Minute Order has been distributed to the Striking Team via email and electronically served to all registered parties for Odyssey File & Serve. /pc 8/4/22 Judge: Israel, Ronald J. |
|
July 28, 2022 | Docket Event |
Status Check: Blocked Account
Judge: Israel, Ronald J. |
|
July 15, 2022 | Docket Event |
Proof of Establishment of Blocked Trust Account Doc ID# 4 [4] Proof of Establishment of Blocked Account |
|
July 06, 2022 | Docket Event |
Proof of Establishment of Blocked Trust Account Doc ID# 3 [3] Proof of Establishment of Blocked Account |
|
May 24, 2022 | Docket Event |
Order Compromising Minors Claim Doc ID# 2 [2] Order Compromising Minor's Claim |
|
May 20, 2022 | Docket Event |
Petition for Compromise of Minors Claim Doc ID# 1 [1] Petition for Compromise of Minors Claim |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.