Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Coizeau-Rizo, Julio C, filed a(n) Compromise Of Minor'S Claim case against Key Insurance, Roberts, Dominique T, in the jurisdiction of Clark County, NV, . Clark County, NV Superior Courts with Clark Newberry presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeClark Newberry Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMay 20, 2022 |
CategoryCompromise Of Minor'S Claim |
Last RefreshedAugust 19, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationClark County, NV |
|
Case Outcome TypeOrder Approving Minor'S Compromise |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 05, 2022 | Docket Event |
Status Check Vacated - Case Closed Judge: Clark Newberry, Tara |
|
September 12, 2022 | Docket Event |
Order Scheduling Status Check Doc ID# 5 [5] Order Setting Status Check |
|
September 12, 2022 | Docket Event |
Voluntary Dismissal Doc ID# 6 [6] Voluntary Dismissal of Minors Compromise petition |
|
August 24, 2022 | Docket Event |
Amended Petition Doc ID# 4 [4] Amended Petition for Minors compromise |
|
May 24, 2022 | Docket Event |
Order Compromising Minors Claim Doc ID# 3 [3] Order Approving Minor's Compromise |
|
May 20, 2022 | Docket Event |
Petition for Compromise of Minors Claim Doc ID# 2 [2] Petition for Compromise of Claim of Minor, Julio A. Coizeau-Cabreco |
|
May 20, 2022 | Docket Event |
Minute Order Upon review of the May 20, 2022 Petition for Compromise of Claim for Minor, Julio A. Coizeau-Cebreco in case A-22-852930-M Court FINDS that the document contains unredacted Personal Identifiable Information. The Court hereby ORDERS the May 20, 2022 Petition for Compromise of Claim for Minor, Julio A. Coizeau-Cebreco filed at 12:09 pm is hereby STRICKEN from the record. It is FURTHER ORDERED Counsel for Plaintiff to REDACT all Personal Identifiable Information (PII) and re-file into the case no later than 5:00 pm on May 23, 2022. CLERK'S NOTE: The above minute order has been electronically served to parties via e-mail and/or Odyssey File & Serve. // pc 05-20-2022. Judge: Clark Newberry, Tara |
|
May 20, 2022 | Docket Event |
Petition for Compromise of Minors Claim Doc ID# 1 [1] Petition for Minor's Compromise |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.