Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
filed a(n) Other Civil Matters case in the jurisdiction of Clark County, NV, . Clark County, NV Superior Courts with Silva, Cristina D. presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeSilva, Cristina D. Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 03, 2020 |
CategoryOther Civil Matters |
Last RefreshedDecember 21, 2021 |
|
Filing LocationClark County, NV |
|
Case Outcome TypeConfession Of Judgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 20, 2021 | Docket Event |
Status Check: Dismissal
Judge: Lilly-Spells, Jasmin |
|
December 16, 2021 | Docket Event |
Association of Counsel Doc ID# 7 [7] Association of Counsel |
|
December 16, 2021 | Docket Event |
Status Report Doc ID# 8 [8] Status Report (First) |
|
December 14, 2021 | Docket Event |
Order to Show Cause Doc ID# 6 [6] Order to Show Cause |
|
February 19, 2021 | Docket Event |
Writ Electronically Issued Doc ID# 4 [4] Writ of Execution issued 2/19/21 |
|
February 19, 2021 | Docket Event |
Writ Electronically Issued Doc ID# 5 [5] Writ of Execution |
|
February 18, 2021 | Docket Event |
Writ of Execution Doc ID# 3 [3] Writ of Execution |
|
January 04, 2021 | Docket Event |
Case Reassigned to Department 23 Judicial Reassignment to Judge Jasmin Lilly-Spells |
|
December 04, 2020 | Docket Event |
Notice of Entry of Judgment Doc ID# 2 [2] Notice of Entry of Confession of Judgment |
|
December 03, 2020 | Docket Event |
Confession of Judgment Doc ID# 1 [1] Confession of Judgment |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.