Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
filed a(n) Compromise Of Minor'S Claim case in the jurisdiction of Clark County, NV, . Clark County, NV Superior Courts with Silva, Cristina D. presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeSilva, Cristina D. Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateOctober 23, 2020 |
CategoryCompromise Of Minor'S Claim |
Last RefreshedDecember 23, 2020 |
|
Filing LocationClark County, NV |
|
Case Outcome TypeOrder Approving Minor'S Compromise |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 22, 2020 | Docket Event |
Status Check: Blocked Account An Order Approving Minor s Compromise was filed in this matter on October 26, 2020. Since sufficient proof of an established blocked account was filed with the court on November 02, 2020, COURT ORDERED, matter OFF CALENDAR and CASE CLOSED. CLERK S NOTE: Counsel are to ensure a copy of the forgoing minute order is distributed to all interested parties; additionally, a copy of the foregoing minute order was distributed to the registered service recipients via Odyssey eFileNV E-Service (12/22/2020 ks). Judge: Silva, Cristina D. |
|
November 02, 2020 | Docket Event |
Proof of Establishment of Blocked Trust Account Proof of Blocked Trust |
|
October 26, 2020 | Docket Event |
Order Compromising Minors Claim Order Approving Minor's Compromise |
|
October 23, 2020 | Docket Event |
Petition for Compromise of Minors Claim Petition for Compromise of Disputed Claim of a Minor |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.