Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case in the jurisdiction of Clark County, NV, . Clark County, NV Superior Courts with Silva, Cristina D. presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeSilva, Cristina D. Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateSeptember 03, 2020 |
CategoryJudicial Foreclosure |
Last RefreshedFebruary 23, 2022 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationClark County, NV |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
Case Outcome TypeDismissal Pursuant To Nrcp 41 |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 08, 2022 | Docket Event |
Status Check
Judge: Lilly-Spells, Jasmin |
|
February 22, 2022 | Docket Event |
Status Check
Judge: Lilly-Spells, Jasmin |
|
February 16, 2022 | Docket Event |
Notice of Rescheduling of Hearing Doc ID# 16 [16] Notice of Rescheduling of Hearing: Status Check Dismissal |
|
January 25, 2022 | Docket Event |
Status Check Dismissal
Judge: Lilly-Spells, Jasmin |
|
January 08, 2021 | Docket Event |
ADR - Action Required Doc ID# 15 [15] Action Required - settled |
|
January 07, 2021 | Docket Event |
ADR - Change of Status Doc ID# 14 [14] Change of Status |
|
January 04, 2021 | Docket Event |
Case Reassigned to Department 23 Judicial Reassignment to Judge Jasmin Lilly-Spells |
|
December 11, 2020 | Docket Event |
Notice of Early Arbitration Conference Doc ID# 13 [13] Notice of Early Arbitration Conference |
|
November 30, 2020 | Docket Event |
Appointment of Arbitrator Doc ID# 11 [11] Appointment of Arbitrator |
|
November 30, 2020 | Docket Event |
Voluntary Dismissal Doc ID# 12 [12] Voluntary Dismissal |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.