Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Pinkowski, Brandon N, filed a(n) Compromise Of Minor'S Claim case against Geico Insurance Company, Travis, Ajanae, in the jurisdiction of Clark County, NV, . Clark County, NV Superior Courts with Silva, Cristina D. presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeSilva, Cristina D. Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJuly 28, 2020 |
CategoryCompromise Of Minor'S Claim |
Last RefreshedNovember 06, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationClark County, NV |
|
Case Outcome TypeOrder Approving Minor'S Compromise |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 05, 2021 | Docket Event |
Order to Statistically Close Case Doc ID# 7 [7] Civil Order to Statistically Close Case |
|
September 07, 2021 | Docket Event |
Status Check: Blocked Account Vacated - Duplicate Entry Judge: Lilly-Spells, Jasmin |
|
September 07, 2021 | Docket Event |
Status Check: Blocked Account
Judge: Lilly-Spells, Jasmin |
|
August 12, 2021 | Docket Event |
Proof of Blocked Account Doc ID# 6 [6] Proof of Blocked Account |
|
July 21, 2021 | Docket Event |
Order Compromising Minors Claim Doc ID# 5 [5] Third Amended Order Approving Compromise of Minor's Claim |
|
June 18, 2021 | Docket Event |
Amended Petition Doc ID# 4 [4] Third Amended Petition for Compromise of Minors Claim - Daisy Linda Hernandez |
|
June 18, 2021 | Docket Event |
Amended Petition Third Amended Petition for Compromise of Minors Claim - Daisy Linda Hernandez |
|
March 01, 2021 | Docket Event |
Amended Petition Doc ID# 3 [3] Amended Petition for Compromise of Minors Claim |
|
March 01, 2021 | Docket Event | Amended Petition for Compromise of Minors Claim | |
January 04, 2021 | Docket Event |
Case Reassigned to Department 23 Judicial Reassignment to Judge Jasmin Lilly-Spells |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.