Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Horvath, Erika Ann, filed a(n) Compromise Of Minor'S Claim case against Young, Jason, State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company, in the jurisdiction of Clark County, NV, . Clark County, NV Superior Courts with Silva, Cristina D. presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeSilva, Cristina D. Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMay 13, 2020 |
CategoryCompromise Of Minor'S Claim |
Last RefreshedNovember 23, 2020 |
|
Filing LocationClark County, NV |
|
Case Outcome TypeOrder Approving Minor'S Compromise |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 27, 2020 | Docket Event |
Status Check: Blocked Account The Status Check on Proof of Blocked Account came before this Court on the August 27, 2020 Chamber Calendar. To date, proof of the blocked account has not been filed. Therefore, COURT ORDERED matter CONTINUED for sixty (60) days. CONTINUED TO: 10/22/2020 3:00 A.M. Counsel are to ensure a copy of the forgoing minute order is distributed to all interested parties; additionally, a copy of the foregoing minute order was distributed to the Odyssey eFileNV E-Service registered parties. (9-16-2020 ks) Judge: Silva, Cristina D. |
|
August 21, 2020 | Docket Event |
Proof of Establishment of Blocked Trust Account Proof of Establishment of Blocked Account |
|
May 18, 2020 | Docket Event | Order Compromising Minors Claim | |
May 13, 2020 | Docket Event |
Petition for Compromise of Minors Claim Petition for Compromise of Minor's Claim |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.