Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Coyu, Trisha M, filed a(n) Compromise Of Minor'S Claim case against Hartford Insurance, Mccaughey, Marie A, in the jurisdiction of Clark County, NV, . Clark County, NV Superior Courts with Silva, Cristina D. presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeSilva, Cristina D. Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateApril 20, 2020 |
CategoryCompromise Of Minor'S Claim |
Last RefreshedAugust 19, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationClark County, NV |
|
Case Outcome TypeOrder Approving Minor'S Compromise |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 04, 2021 | Docket Event |
Case Reassigned to Department 23 Judicial Reassignment to Judge Jasmin Lilly-Spells |
|
December 21, 2020 | Docket Event |
Order to Statistically Close Case Doc ID# 5 [5] Civil Order to Statistically Close Case |
|
June 22, 2020 | Docket Event |
Status Check: Blocked Account The Status Check on Proof of Blocked Account came before this Court on the June 22, 2020, Chamber Calendar. Since sufficient proof of an established blocked account was filed on April 29, 2020, COURT ORDERED, matter OFF CALENDAR; CASE CLOSED. Judge: Silva, Cristina D. |
|
April 29, 2020 | Docket Event |
Proof of Blocked Account Doc ID# 4 [4] Proof of Blocked Trust Account |
|
April 29, 2020 | Docket Event |
Proof of Blocked Account Proof of Blocked Trust Account |
|
April 27, 2020 | Docket Event |
Notice of Entry of Order Doc ID# 3 [3] Notice of Entry of Order |
|
April 27, 2020 | Docket Event | Notice of Entry of Order | |
April 24, 2020 | Docket Event |
Order Compromising Minors Claim Doc ID# 2 [2] Order Granting Petition for Compromise of a Minor's Claim |
|
April 24, 2020 | Docket Event |
Order Compromising Minors Claim Order Granting Petition for Compromise of a Minor's Claim |
|
April 20, 2020 | Docket Event |
Petition for Compromise of Minors Claim Doc ID# 1 [1] Petition for Compromise of a Minor's Claim - Zayden L. Scurry |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.