Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
filed a(n) Guardianship,Conservatorship - Probate case in the jurisdiction of Clark County, NV, . Clark County, NV Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJuly 26, 2021 |
CategoryGuardianship Of Adult |
Last RefreshedAugust 07, 2021 |
Practice AreaProbate |
Filing LocationClark County, NV |
Matter TypeGuardianship,Conservatorship |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 16, 2021 | Docket Event |
Citation to Appear and Show Cause
Judge: Marquis, Linda |
|
August 06, 2021 | Docket Event |
Notice of Hearing Doc ID# 12 [12] Notice of Hearing |
|
August 06, 2021 | Docket Event |
Minute Order
Judge: Marquis, Linda |
|
August 06, 2021 | Docket Event |
Clerk's Notice of Nonconforming Document and Curative Action Doc ID# 11 [11] Clerk's Notice of Nonconforming Document and Curative Action |
|
August 04, 2021 | Docket Event |
Statement of Legal Aid Representation and Fee Waiver Doc ID# 10 [10] Statement of Legal Aid Representation |
|
July 27, 2021 | Docket Event |
Letters of Temporary Guardianship Doc ID# 6 [6] Letters of Temporary Guardianship - Not Issued (No Order on filed) |
|
July 27, 2021 | Docket Event |
Notice of Guardianship Nomination Registry Review Doc ID# 9 [9] Notice of Guardianship Nomination Registry Review |
|
July 26, 2021 | Docket Event |
Physicians Certificate Doc ID# 5 [5] Physicians Certificate |
|
July 26, 2021 | Docket Event |
Application Doc ID# 1 [1] Temporary Emergency Adult Guardianship - Multiple Documents |
|
July 26, 2021 | Docket Event |
Declaration of Service Doc ID# 7 [7] Declaration of Service on Adult Proposed Protected Person |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.