Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
filed a(n) Guardianship,Conservatorship - Probate case in the jurisdiction of Clark County, NV, . Clark County, NV Superior Courts with Denise L. Gentile presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeDenise L. Gentile Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 30, 2016 |
CategoryGuardianship Of Adult |
Last RefreshedMay 29, 2021 |
Practice AreaProbate |
Filing LocationClark County, NV |
Matter TypeGuardianship,Conservatorship |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 28, 2021 | Docket Event |
Review Notice of Non-Compliance Judge: Gentile, Denise L |
|
May 04, 2021 | Docket Event | Report of the Guardian | |
April 12, 2021 | Docket Event | Notice of Non-Compliance | |
January 04, 2021 | Docket Event |
Administrative Reassignment to Department F Judicial Reassignment - From Judge William Potter to Judge Denise Gentile |
|
April 24, 2020 | Docket Event | Report of the Guardian | |
April 13, 2020 | Docket Event | Notice of Non-Compliance | |
July 24, 2019 | Docket Event |
Guardianship Compliance Letter Mailed ROG |
|
July 22, 2019 | Docket Event |
Guardianship Compliance Letter Mailed ROG |
|
July 11, 2019 | Docket Event |
Order to Show Cause Vacated Judge: Potter, William) VacatedCase Compliance (ROG |
|
June 28, 2019 | Docket Event |
Report of the Guardian Report of Guardian of the Adult Person |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.