Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Parks, April L, filed a(n) Guardianship,Conservatorship - Probate case in the jurisdiction of Clark County, NV, . Clark County, NV Superior Courts with Cynthia D. Steel presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeCynthia D. Steel Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 28, 2012 |
CategoryGuardianship Of Adult |
Last RefreshedNovember 27, 2020 |
Practice AreaProbate |
Filing LocationClark County, NV |
Matter TypeGuardianship,Conservatorship |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 17, 2017 | Docket Event |
Administrative Reassignment to Department M Case reassigned from Judge Cynthia Dianne Steel Dept G |
|
June 01, 2015 | Docket Event | Administrative Reassignment to Department G | |
December 18, 2014 | Docket Event |
Order of Final Discharge Order for Final Discharge |
|
November 25, 2014 | Docket Event | Order to Statistically Close Case | |
April 29, 2014 | Docket Event | Order Terminating Guardianship and Approval of Final Accounting | |
April 29, 2014 | Docket Event | Notice of Entry of Order | |
April 24, 2014 | Docket Event |
Hearing - HM Hearing on Petition to Termination the Guardianship and Approve Final Accounting Over the Person and Estate |
|
March 25, 2014 | Docket Event | Affidavit of Mailing | |
March 17, 2014 | Docket Event | Notice of Hearing | |
March 13, 2014 | Docket Event | Petition to Terminate Guardianship and Approve Final Accounting |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.