Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Rinfret, Sheryl Ann, Graham, Robert C, Esq, Ballee', Steven E, filed a(n) Guardianship,Conservatorship - Probate case in the jurisdiction of Clark County, NV, . Clark County, NV Superior Courts with Cynthia D. Steel presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeCynthia D. Steel Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJune 29, 2007 |
CategoryGuardianship Of Adult |
Last RefreshedNovember 21, 2020 |
Practice AreaProbate |
Filing LocationClark County, NV |
Matter TypeGuardianship,Conservatorship |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 17, 2017 | Docket Event |
Administrative Reassignment to Department M Case reassigned from Judge Cynthia Dianne Steel Dept G |
|
June 01, 2015 | Docket Event | Administrative Reassignment to Department G | |
July 26, 2012 | Docket Event | Order to Statistically Close Case | |
December 01, 2011 | Docket Event | Notice of Entry of Order Terminating Guardianship, Approving Final Account, and Approving Payment of Attorney's Fees and Costs | |
November 23, 2011 | Docket Event | Order Terminating Guardianship, Approving Final Account, and Approving Payment of Attorney's Fees and Costs | |
May 09, 2011 | Docket Event | Stipulation and Order on Final Accounting | |
November 03, 2010 | Docket Event |
Hearing to Terminate Guardianship
Judge: Norheim, Jon |
|
November 01, 2010 | Docket Event | Reply to TLC's Opposition on Termination of Guardianship | |
November 01, 2010 | Docket Event | Inventory and Record of Value | |
October 18, 2010 | Docket Event | Notice of Hearing of Petition to Terminate Guardianship, for Approval of Final Accounting, and for Approval of Payment of Attorney's Fees and Costs |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.