Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Heeter, Michael, filed a(n) Guardianship,Conservatorship - Probate case in the jurisdiction of Clark County, NV, . Clark County, NV Superior Courts with Linda Marquis presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeLinda Marquis Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJune 27, 2007 |
CategoryGuardianship Of Adult |
Last RefreshedNovember 23, 2020 |
Practice AreaProbate |
Filing LocationClark County, NV |
Matter TypeGuardianship,Conservatorship |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 04, 2019 | Docket Event |
Administrative Reassignment to Department B Judicial Reassignment - From Judge Vincent Ochoa to Judge Linda Marquis |
|
January 17, 2017 | Docket Event |
Administrative Reassignment to Department S Case reassigned from Judge Cynthia Dianne Steel Dept G |
|
June 01, 2015 | Docket Event | Administrative Reassignment to Department G | |
October 05, 2009 | Docket Event |
Affidavit of Mailing NOTICE OF ENTRY OF ORDER(was returned by the United States Post Office) |
|
September 16, 2009 | Docket Event |
Notice of Entry of Order order terminating guardianship |
|
September 16, 2009 | Docket Event |
Order Terminating Guardianship And Closure of Case |
|
May 08, 2009 | Docket Event |
Administrative Reassignment Reassigned from Department B to Department E |
|
December 30, 2008 | Docket Event |
Administrative Reassignment Reassigned from Department H to Department B |
|
July 18, 2007 | Docket Event |
Citation - HM
Judge: Norheim, Jon |
|
July 05, 2007 | Docket Event |
Hearing to Extend Temporary Guardianship
Judge: Norheim, Jon |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.