Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Kelly, Karen, Buchanan, Kathleen, filed a(n) Guardianship,Conservatorship - Probate case in the jurisdiction of Clark County, NV, . Clark County, NV Superior Courts with Cynthia D. Steel presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeCynthia D. Steel Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJune 26, 2007 |
CategoryGuardianship Of Adult |
Last RefreshedNovember 23, 2020 |
Practice AreaProbate |
Filing LocationClark County, NV |
Matter TypeGuardianship,Conservatorship |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 14, 2017 | Docket Event | Notice of Entry of Order of Final Discharge | |
March 13, 2017 | Docket Event | Order of Final Discharge | |
January 17, 2017 | Docket Event |
Administrative Reassignment to Department M Case reassigned from Judge Cynthia Dianne Steel Dept G |
|
October 13, 2016 | Docket Event | Receipt of Estate of Robert McClure | |
July 28, 2016 | Docket Event |
Domestic Notice to Statistically Close Case USJR -Guardianship Statistical Case Status |
|
June 21, 2016 | Docket Event | Receipt of Estate of Robert McClure | |
May 26, 2016 | Docket Event | Receipt of Clark County Public Guardian | |
May 26, 2016 | Docket Event | Receipt of Larson & Zirzow, LLC | |
May 10, 2016 | Docket Event |
Domestic Notice to Statistically Close Case USJR -- Guardianship Statistical Case Status |
|
May 05, 2016 | Docket Event | Notice of Entry of Order Approving Eighth and Final Account, Report of Kathleen Buchanan, Petition for Fees, Termination, and Discharge |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.