Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
filed a(n) Child Custody Complaint case in the jurisdiction of Clark County, NV, . Clark County, NV Superior Courts with Nadin Cutter presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeNadin Cutter Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 31, 2019 |
CategoryChild Custody Complaint |
Last RefreshedOctober 12, 2021 |
|
Filing LocationClark County, NV |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 07, 2022 | Docket Event |
Evidentiary Hearing (1/2 Day)
Judge: Cutter, Nadin) Evidentiary Hearing (1/2 Day |
|
February 23, 2022 | Docket Event |
Calendar Call
Judge: Cutter, Nadin |
|
October 11, 2021 | Docket Event |
Motion Vacated - No Service Judge: Cutter, Nadin |
|
October 11, 2021 | Docket Event |
Motion and Notice of Motion to Modify Child Custody, Visitation, and/or Child Support
Judge: Cutter, Nadin |
|
October 08, 2021 | Docket Event |
Certificate of Service Doc ID# 103 [103] Cserv |
|
October 08, 2021 | Docket Event |
Notice Doc ID# 102 [102] Notice of Vacating of Hearing |
|
September 17, 2021 | Docket Event |
Order Shortening Time Doc ID# 101 [101] Order Shortening Time |
|
September 16, 2021 | Docket Event |
Ex Parte Doc ID# 100 [100] EX PARTE MOTION |
|
September 15, 2021 | Docket Event |
Notice of Hearing Doc ID# 99 [99] Notice of Hearing |
|
September 15, 2021 | Docket Event |
Motion Doc ID# 98 [98] Motion and Notice of Motion to Modify Child Custody, Visitation, and/or Child Support |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.