Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
De La Cruz Zamora, Norma Elizabeth, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case represented by Madeline La Forgia, Esq, against Rubio-Jurado, Ruperto, represented by Jeffrey I. Shaner, Esq, in the jurisdiction of Clark County, NV, . Clark County, NV Superior Courts with Sunny Bailey presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeSunny Bailey Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 31, 2019 |
CategoryDivorce - Complaint |
Last RefreshedJuly 10, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationClark County, NV |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 16, 2021 | Docket Event |
Evidentiary Hearing Continued / Submission of Decree Judge: Bailey, Sunny |
|
July 09, 2021 | Docket Event |
Evidentiary Hearing Half-day / Pending Decree Judge: Bailey, Sunny |
|
July 08, 2021 | Docket Event | Order (4-7-21 Calendar Call) | |
July 08, 2021 | Docket Event | Notice of Entry of Order | |
July 08, 2021 | Docket Event | Certificate of Service | |
June 30, 2021 | Docket Event |
Calendar Call Continued Judge: Bailey, Sunny |
|
June 23, 2021 | Docket Event |
Calendar Call
Judge: Bailey, Sunny |
|
May 20, 2021 | Docket Event |
Status Check Re: Settlement Judge: Bailey, Sunny |
|
May 20, 2021 | Docket Event | Case Management Order | |
April 29, 2021 | Docket Event |
Evidentiary Hearing Vacated - per Judge Judge: Bailey, Sunny |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.