Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Irving, Cartaye Dramun, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case represented by Pro Se, against Goings, Ashley Lynn, in the jurisdiction of Clark County, NV, . Clark County, NV Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 26, 2019 |
CategoryDivorce - Complaint |
Last RefreshedNovember 22, 2020 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationClark County, NV |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 20, 2020 | Docket Event |
Notice of Entry of Dismissal without Prejudice Notice of Entry of Order of Dismissal without Prejudice |
|
August 19, 2020 | Docket Event | Order of Dismissal without Prejudice | |
May 15, 2020 | Docket Event | Motion to Seek Status Check, Update, on Decision of Divorce in the Courts of Law | |
February 24, 2020 | Docket Event | Notice of Entry of Order Pursuant to EDCR 5.104 | |
February 20, 2020 | Docket Event | Order Pursuant to EDCR 5.104 | |
January 31, 2020 | Docket Event |
Motion and Notice of Motion to Establish Paternity and/or for DNA Testing
Judge: Gentile, Denise L |
|
January 17, 2020 | Docket Event | Order to Proceed In Forma Pauperis | |
December 27, 2019 | Docket Event | Notice of Department Reassignment | |
December 26, 2019 | Docket Event | Summons Issued Only | |
December 26, 2019 | Docket Event | Motion and Notice of Motion to Establish Paternity and/or for DNA Testing |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.