Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Mona, Rana A, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case represented by Jared B. Jennings, against Mona, Bashar F, represented by Matthew P. Pawlowski, in the jurisdiction of Clark County, NV, . Clark County, NV Superior Courts with David S. Gibson, Jr. presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeDavid S. Gibson, Jr. Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 30, 2016 |
CategoryDivorce - Complaint |
Last RefreshedNovember 27, 2020 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationClark County, NV |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 06, 2020 | Docket Event |
Administrative Reassignment to Department H Civil Domestic Case Reassignment from Judge David Gibson Jr. Department L |
|
December 10, 2018 | Docket Event |
Administrative Reassignment - Judicial Officer Change Judicial Reassignment - From Judge Jennifer Elliott to Judge David Gibson Jr. Judge: ChangeJudicial Reassignment - From Judge Jennifer Elliott to Judge David Gibson Jr. |
|
April 23, 2018 | Docket Event | Notice of Entry of Order | |
April 23, 2018 | Docket Event | Order | |
March 13, 2018 | Docket Event |
Status Check
Judge: Elliott, Jennifer |
|
January 23, 2018 | Docket Event |
Evidentiary Hearing Vacated - per Law Clerk Judge: Elliott, Jennifer |
|
October 20, 2017 | Docket Event |
Trial Management Order Evidentiary Hearing Management Order |
|
October 10, 2017 | Docket Event |
Calendar Call
Judge: Elliott, Jennifer |
|
October 05, 2017 | Docket Event |
Pre-trial Memorandum PLAINTIFF'S EVIDENTIARY HEARING BRIEF |
|
October 03, 2017 | Docket Event |
Brief Defendant's Evidentiary Hearing Brief |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.