Case Last Refreshed: 22 hours ago
Contreras Diaz, Judith E, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case represented by Pro Se, against Contreras Diaz, Jose Ernesto, represented by Pro Se, in the jurisdiction of Clark County, NV, . Clark County, NV Superior Courts District with Linda Marquis presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeLinda Marquis Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 28, 2016 |
CategoryDivorce - Complaint |
Last RefreshedApril 24, 2024 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationClark County, NV |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Filing Court HouseDistrict |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 04, 2019 | Docket Event |
Administrative Reassignment to Department S Judicial Reassignment - From Judge Linda Marquis to Judge Vincent Ochoa |
|
October 06, 2017 | Docket Event |
Non-Jury Trial Vacated - per Stipulation and Order Judge: Marquis, Linda |
|
September 27, 2017 | Docket Event |
Order Doc ID# 22 [22] Order Granting Motion to Withdraw as Attorney of Record for Defendant |
|
September 27, 2017 | Docket Event |
Notice of Entry of Order Doc ID# 23 [23] Notice of Entry of Order |
|
September 27, 2017 | Docket Event | Order Granting Motion to Withdraw as Attorney of Record for Defendant | |
September 27, 2017 | Docket Event | Notice of Entry of Order | |
September 26, 2017 | Docket Event |
Calendar Call Vacated - per Stipulation and Order Judge: Marquis, Linda |
|
September 25, 2017 | Docket Event |
Minute Order
Judge: Marquis, Linda |
|
September 25, 2017 | Docket Event |
Motion to Withdraw As Attorney Of Record
Judge: s Marquis, Linda, Hardcastle, Kathy |
|
September 22, 2017 | Docket Event |
Stipulation and Order Doc ID# 21 [21] Stipulation and Order |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.