Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Ford, Jason Vincent, Ford, Erin Gretchen Elizabeth, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case in the jurisdiction of Clark County, NV, . Clark County, NV Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 27, 2012 |
CategoryDivorce - Joint Petition |
Last RefreshedNovember 23, 2020 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationClark County, NV |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 21, 2020 | Docket Event | Notice of Entry of Order from January 2, 2020 Hearing | |
April 21, 2020 | Docket Event | Notice of Withdrawal of Attorney for Plaintiff | |
April 20, 2020 | Docket Event | Order for January 02, 2020 Hearing | |
January 02, 2020 | Docket Event |
Return Hearing FMC Child Interview Judge: Harter, Mathew |
|
January 02, 2020 | Docket Event |
Parenting Agreement Partial Parenting Agreement |
|
November 21, 2019 | Docket Event | Notice of Change of Address (FAM) | |
November 19, 2019 | Docket Event |
Motion Plaintiff's Motion to Modify Physical Custody, to Review and Modify Child Support, for Permission to Conduct Post-Divorce Discovery, and for Plaintiff's Attorney's Fees and Costs Incurred Herein, and Related Matters Judge: Harter, Mathew |
|
November 19, 2019 | Docket Event | Order for Family Mediation Center Services | |
November 19, 2019 | Docket Event | Order for the OurFamilyWizard Website Services | |
November 05, 2019 | Docket Event | Notice of Change of Address (FAM) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.