Search anything: judges, parties, opposing counsel, motion types, legal issues

We are checking for the latest updates in this case. We will email you when the process is complete.

Desiree Fahey-Rice, Plaintiff vs. Eric Rice, Defendant.

Case Last Refreshed: 6 months, 2 weeks

Case Overview

On December 28, 2007 case was filed by (Subcribe to view) against (Subscribe to view) in the jurisdiction of Clark County. Judge Moss, Cheryl B. presiding.

Case Details

Case Number

(Subscribe to View)

Filing Date

December 28, 2007

Last Refreshed

Jan 11, 2021

Filing Location

Clark County, NV

Judge

Moss, Cheryl B.

Category

Divorce - Complaint

Case Outcome Type

Judgment

Parties

Subject Minor

Subject Minor

Attorney For The Plaintiff

See all parties

Case History

Type Title - Description Documents
Docket Event Notice of Entry Of Order From October 8 2019-Hearing
Docket Event Notice of Entry of Order From April 29, 2019 Hearing
Docket Event Order from April 29, 2019 Hearing
Docket Event Order from October 8, 2018 Hearing
Docket Event Evidentiary Hearing (Stack 1)

judge: Moss, Cheryl B.) Evidentiary Hearing (Stack 1

Docket Event Estimate of Transcript
Hearing date November 18, 2018
Docket Event Order from Return Hearing
Docket Event Notice of Entry of Order and Attached Order
Docket Event Notice of Withdrawal as Counsel for Defendant
Docket Event Return Hearing
FMC: Child Interview

judge: Moss, Cheryl B.

Showing See all events

Document Requested

Your request has been received. We will email you this document within 4 business hours.

You have used out of 0 document requests left today

Continue

Document Requested

You have exceeded your document request limit for today.

If you need immediate assistance, please contact [email protected]

Continue

Docket Refresh Requested

Your docket refresh request has been received. You will receive a notification when the docket is refreshed.

Continue

Docket Refresh Requested

A refresh is already in progress.

If you need immediate assistance, please contact [email protected]

Continue

For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.

Please wait a moment while we load this page.