Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case in the jurisdiction of Clark County, NV, . Clark County, NV Superior Courts with Nadin Cutter presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeNadin Cutter Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJanuary 01, 2009 |
CategoryDivorce - Complaint |
Last RefreshedFebruary 11, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationClark County, NV |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 10, 2021 | Docket Event |
Opposition & Countermotion Defendant's Opposition to Motion for an Order to Show Cause why the Defendant Should not be Held in Contempt for Failing to Abide by the Terms of the Decree; for Alternatively, for Enforcement of the Custodial Agreement; for Orders for Family Therapy and Parenting Coordinator; for Child Support to bo Modified Purusant to a Modificiation of Custody; for Plaintiff's Attorney's Fees and Costs, and for Related Relief Judge: Cutter, Nadin |
|
February 10, 2021 | Docket Event | Stipulation and Order | |
February 10, 2021 | Docket Event |
Hearing Plaintiff's Reply to Defendant's Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for an Order to Show Cause Judge: Cutter, Nadin |
|
February 10, 2021 | Docket Event |
All Pending Motions
Judge: Cutter, Nadin |
|
February 10, 2021 | Docket Event |
Motion Plaintiff's Motion for an Order to show Cause why the Defendant Should not be Held in Contempt for Failing to Abide by the Terms of the Decree; or Alternatively, for Enforcement of the Custodial Agreement; for Orders for Family Theraphy and Parenting Coordinator; for Child Support to be Modified Pursuant to a Modification of Custody; for Plaintiff's Attorney's Fees and Costs, and for Related Relief Judge: Cutter, Nadin |
|
January 11, 2021 | Docket Event | Notice of Rescheduling of Hearing | |
January 04, 2021 | Docket Event |
Administrative Reassignment - Judicial Officer Change Judicial Reassignment to Judge Nadin Cutter Judge: ChangeJudicial Reassignment to Judge Nadin Cutter |
|
January 04, 2021 | Docket Event | Certificate of Service | |
January 04, 2021 | Docket Event |
Reply Plaintiff's Reply to Defendant's Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for an Order to Show Cause |
|
November 19, 2020 | Docket Event | Stipulation and Order to Continue the Motion Hearing Scheduled for November 20, 2020 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.