Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Broadnax, Charmalita, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case represented by Pro Se, against Broadnax, Larry J, represented by Lesley Cohen, in the jurisdiction of Clark County, NV, . Clark County, NV Superior Courts with Elliott, Jennifer presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeElliott, Jennifer Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJune 29, 2007 |
CategoryDivorce - Complaint |
Last RefreshedJanuary 12, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationClark County, NV |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 05, 2015 | Docket Event |
Judicial Elections 2014 - Case Reassignment Family Court Judicial Officer Reassignment 2014 Judge: Reassignment 2014 |
|
April 15, 2013 | Docket Event |
Administrative Reassignment to Department C Case reassigned from Judge Robert Teuton Dept D |
|
December 01, 2010 | Docket Event | Notice of Change of Address | |
May 09, 2009 | Docket Event | Administrative reassignment from Department L to Department D | |
March 23, 2009 | Docket Event |
Notice of Withdrawal of Counsel |
|
March 18, 2009 | Docket Event |
Affirmation Pursuant TO NRS 239B.030 |
|
March 18, 2009 | Docket Event | Qualified Domestic Relation Order | |
January 05, 2009 | Docket Event |
Motion to Amend Pltf' Motion to Amend Divorce Decree and Related Relief Judge: Elliott, Jennifer |
|
January 05, 2009 | Docket Event |
Decree of Divorce Amended |
|
December 08, 2008 | Docket Event | Family Court Motion Opposition Fee Information Sheet |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.