Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Ziegler, Michael Allen, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case represented by Pro Se, against Ziegler, Brittany Leigh, represented by Pro Se, in the jurisdiction of Clark County, NV, . Clark County, NV Superior Courts with Pomrenze, Sandra presiding.
Case Number |
JudgePomrenze, Sandra Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJune 27, 2007 |
CategoryDivorce - Complaint |
Last RefreshedJanuary 12, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationClark County, NV |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 06, 2019 | Docket Event |
Administrative Reassignment - Judicial Officer Change From Judge Cynthia Dianne Steel to Judge Rhonda K. Forsberg Judge: ChangeFrom Judge Cynthia Dianne Steel to Judge Rhonda K. Forsberg |
|
January 17, 2017 | Docket Event |
Administrative Reassignment to Department G Case reassigned from Judge William Potter Dept M |
|
September 30, 2015 | Docket Event | Certificate of Mailing | |
September 30, 2015 | Docket Event | Notice of Entry of Order | |
September 09, 2015 | Docket Event | Order | |
May 05, 2015 | Docket Event |
Opposition & Countermotion Defendant's Opposition To Motion To Modify Child Custody, Visitation, And/Or Child Support And CounterMotion Judge: Potter, William |
|
May 05, 2015 | Docket Event |
Motion Pltf's Motion for Orders to Modify Child Custody, Visitation, and/or Child Support Judge: Potter, William |
|
May 05, 2015 | Docket Event |
All Pending Motions PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO SET ASIDE ORDER OR JUDGMENT...PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR ORDER TO MODIFY CHILD CUSTODY, VISITATION, AND/OR CHILD SUPPORT...DEFENDANT'S OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO MODIFY CHILD CUSTODY, VISITATION, AND/OR CHILD SUPPORT AND COUNTERMOTION Judge: Potter, William |
|
April 24, 2015 | Docket Event | Opposition To Motion To Modify Child Custody | |
April 23, 2015 | Docket Event | certificate of mailing |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.