Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Tucker, Richard, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case represented by Pro Se, against Tucker, Carolyn, represented by Harry Paul Marquis, in the jurisdiction of Clark County, NV, . Clark County, NV Superior Courts with Duckworth, Bryce C. presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeDuckworth, Bryce C. Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJuly 01, 1975 |
CategoryDivorce - Complaint |
Last RefreshedJanuary 12, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationClark County, NV |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 14, 2013 | Docket Event | Domestic Notice to Statistically Close Case | |
January 04, 2013 | Docket Event | Notice of Withdrawal | |
December 28, 2012 | Docket Event | Notice of Entry of Order | |
December 28, 2012 | Docket Event |
Qualified Domestic Relation Order Qualified Domestic Relations Order: Order Dividing Railroad Retirement Benefits |
|
December 28, 2012 | Docket Event | Order from December 5, 2012 Hearing | |
December 28, 2012 | Docket Event |
Notice of Entry of Order Notice of Entry of Qualified Domestic Relations Order |
|
December 05, 2012 | Docket Event |
Motion Deft's Motion for Entry of a QDRO and for Attorney's Fees Judge: Duckworth, Bryce C. |
|
December 05, 2012 | Docket Event |
All Pending Motions
Judge: Duckworth, Bryce C. |
|
December 05, 2012 | Docket Event |
Opposition & Countermotion Pltf's Opposition & Countermotion To Set Aside And For Attorney's Fees Judge: Duckworth, Bryce C. |
|
December 04, 2012 | Docket Event | Reply in Support of Motion for Entry of a QDRO and for Attorney's Fees and Opposition to Countermotion to set Aside and For Attorney's Fees |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.