Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
filed a(n) Compromise Of Minor'S Claim case in the jurisdiction of Clark County, NV, . Clark County, NV Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateAugust 18, 2021 |
CategoryCompromise Of Minor'S Claim |
Last RefreshedAugust 21, 2021 |
|
Filing LocationClark County, NV |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 12, 2021 | Docket Event |
Status Check: Blocked Account
Judge: Allf, Nancy |
|
August 20, 2021 | Docket Event |
Minute Order COURT FINDS after review that on August 18, 2021 a Petition for Compromise of Minor s Claim was filed. COURT FURTHER FINDS after review that on August 20, 2021 an Order Compromising Minor s Claim was filed. THEREFORE COURT ORDERS for good cause appearing and after review a Status Check: Blocked Account is hereby scheduled for October 12, 2021 on Chambers Calendar, 10/12/2021 (CHAMBERS) STATUS CHECK: BLOCKED ACCOUNT CLERK'S NOTE: This Minute Order was electronically served by Courtroom Clerk, Nicole McDevitt, to all registered parties for Odyssey File & Serve. /nm 8/20/2021. Judge: Allf, Nancy |
|
August 20, 2021 | Docket Event |
Order Compromising Minors Claim Doc ID# 2 [2] MC Order |
|
August 18, 2021 | Docket Event |
Petition for Compromise of Minors Claim Doc ID# 1 [1] Petition to Compromise Disputed Claim of Minors |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.