Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Dara J Goldsmith filed a(n) Landlord-Tenant - Property case represented by Pro Se, against John T Swaine & J Marilyn Swaine Revocable Family Trust, in the jurisdiction of Clark County, NV, . Clark County, NV Superior Courts with Adriana Escobar presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeAdriana Escobar Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateAugust 05, 2021 |
CategoryAppeal From Lower Court - Evictions/Tpo |
Last RefreshedAugust 19, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationClark County, NV |
Matter TypeLandlord-Tenant |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 27, 2023 | Docket Event |
Case Reassigned to Department 14 Pursuant to Administrative Order 23-01 - Reassigned to Judge Adriana Escobar |
|
September 28, 2021 | Docket Event |
Order Denying Doc ID# 3 [3] Order of Affirmance |
|
August 30, 2021 | Docket Event |
Minute Order Due to the change in the court's schedule, the Appeal from Lower Court, scheduled for 9/7/21 is rescheduled for 9/8/21 at 9:00 a.m. 09/08/21 9:00 A.M. APPEAL FROM LOWER COURT CLERK S NOTE: A copy of this minute order was served to all parties registered with e-file and serve and mailed to Deborah Swaine at 7004 Rotunda Ct, LV NV 89130 . clm 8/30/21 Judge: Eller, Crystal |
|
August 17, 2021 | Docket Event |
Appeal From Lower Court Counsel appeared via BlueJeans. Mr. Weinstock requested a two (2) week continuance for pending settlement negotiations. COURT ORDERED, Eviction STAY remains in force; matter CONTINUED. CONTINUED TO: 09/07/21 9:30 A.M. Judge: Eller, Crystal |
|
August 11, 2021 | Docket Event |
Notice of Hearing Doc ID# 2 [2] Notice Of Scheduling Hearing On Appeal From Lower Court |
|
August 05, 2021 | Docket Event |
Appeal from Lower Court Doc ID# 1 [1] Order Regarding Appeal to District Court from Order of Summary Eviction (Residential) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.