Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
filed a(n) Unlawful Detainer - Property case in the jurisdiction of Clark County, NV, . Clark County, NV Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJuly 26, 2021 |
CategoryUnlawful Detainer |
Last RefreshedSeptember 03, 2021 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationClark County, NV |
Matter TypeUnlawful Detainer |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 02, 2021 | Docket Event |
Motion Plaintiff's Emergency Application for Amended Writ of Restituion With Emergncy Hearing on an Order Shortening Time Also present, Jeffrey Rogan, District Attorney and Representative for the Constables Office. Mr. Dagher provided case history and an update concerning the tenant issue. Mr. Rogan stated they were concerned it was operating as an illegal home for addiction. Counsel acknowledged the Court already issued the Amended Writ. Judge: Johnson, Susan |
|
August 31, 2021 | Docket Event |
Notice of Entry of Order Doc ID# 17 [17] Notice of Entry of Order Directing Issuance of Temporary Writ of Restitution |
|
August 31, 2021 | Docket Event |
Application Doc ID# 14 [14] Plaintiff's Emergency Application for Amended Writ of Restitution Emergency Hearing Requested on Order Shortening Time |
|
August 31, 2021 | Docket Event |
Order Doc ID# 15 [15] Order Directing Issuance of Emergency Temporary Writ of Restitution |
|
August 31, 2021 | Docket Event |
Writ of Restitution Doc ID# 16 [16] Writ of Restitution |
|
August 26, 2021 | Docket Event |
Notice of Entry of Order Doc ID# 13 [13] Notice of Entry of Order Directing Issuance of Temporary Writ of Restitution |
|
August 25, 2021 | Docket Event |
Notice of Posting Bond Doc ID# 12 [12] Notice of Posting Bond of Indemnification |
|
August 24, 2021 | Docket Event |
Order Doc ID# 10 [10] Order Directing Issuance of Temporary Writ of Restitution |
|
August 24, 2021 | Docket Event |
Writ of Restitution Doc ID# 11 [11] Writ of Restitution |
|
August 19, 2021 | Docket Event |
Motion for Order to Show Cause Plaintiff's Application for an Order to Show Cause Why a Temporary Writ of Restitution Should Not Issue in Favor of Plaintiff Judge: Johnson, Susan |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.