Case Last Refreshed: 1 month ago
Sheridan, Rene, filed a(n) Other Civil Matters case represented by Michael R. Mushkin, Pro Se, against Gutierrez, Joseph A, Esq, Knaus, Steven, Esq, Maier Gutierrez & Associates, Maier, Jason, Esq, represented by Joseph P Garin, in the jurisdiction of Clark County, NV, . Clark County, NV Superior Courts with Johnson, Susan presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeJohnson, Susan Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJuly 20, 2021 |
CategoryOther Civil Matters |
Last RefreshedFebruary 22, 2024 |
|
Filing LocationClark County, NV |
|
Case Outcome TypeClerk'S Certificate |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 29, 2024 | Docket Event |
Jury Trial
Judge: Johnson, Susan |
|
July 17, 2024 | Docket Event |
Pretrial/Calendar Call
Judge: Johnson, Susan |
|
March 11, 2024 | Docket Event |
Jury Trial Vacated Judge: Johnson, Susan |
|
March 11, 2024 | Docket Event |
Jury Trial
Judge: Johnson, Susan |
|
February 28, 2024 | Docket Event |
Calendar Call
Judge: Johnson, Susan |
|
February 21, 2024 | Docket Event |
Order Granting Motion Doc ID# 208 [208] Order Granting Motion to Withdraw as Counsel of Record for Plaintiff |
|
February 21, 2024 | Docket Event |
Amended Order Setting Jury Trial Doc ID# 209 [209] Amended Order Setting Civil Jury Trial |
|
February 21, 2024 | Docket Event |
Pretrial/Calendar Call
Judge: Johnson, Susan |
|
February 21, 2024 | Docket Event |
Case Appeal Statement Doc ID# 207 [207] Case Appeal Statement |
|
February 21, 2024 | Docket Event |
Motion to Withdraw as Plaintiff's Counsel of Record and Order Shortening Time
Judge: Johnson, Susan |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.