Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Alpharidge Capital Llc, filed a(n) Other Civil Matters case represented by Jay A. Shafer, against Nashville Records, Inc., in the jurisdiction of Clark County, NV, . Clark County, NV Superior Courts with Nancy L. Allf presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeNancy L. Allf Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJuly 19, 2021 |
CategoryOther Civil Matters |
Last RefreshedAugust 19, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationClark County, NV |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 27, 2023 | Docket Event |
Notice of Entry of Order Doc ID# 22 [22] Notice of Entry of Order Granting Alpharidge Capital LLCs Motion to Discharge Custodianship and Enter Final Order |
|
March 24, 2023 | Docket Event |
Order Granting Doc ID# 21 [21] Order Granting Alpharidge Capital LLC's Motion to Discharge Custodianship and Enter Final Order |
|
March 23, 2023 | Docket Event |
Motion Vacated Judge: Allf, Nancy |
|
March 22, 2023 | Docket Event |
Minute Order: Motion to Discharge Custodianship set on 3/23/2023 GRANTED and VACATED COURT FINDS after review that on February 9, 2023, Alpharidge Capital LLC S Motion to Discharge Custodianship and Enter Final Order ( Motion to Discharge ) was filed. The Motion to Discharge requested a hearing that was set for March 23, 2023, on Motion Calendar. The Motion to Discharge requests that this Court enter an Order (1) approving the custodial acts taken by ALPHARIDGE CAPITAL LLC, (2) discharging ALPHARIDGE CAPITAL LLC as custodian of NASHVILLE RECORDS, INC.; (3) returning control of NASHVILLE RECORDS, INC. to the Board of Directors; and (4) ratifying and approving the actions of the Corporation during the custodianship. COURT FURTHER FINDS after review that on July 19, 2021, Alpharidge Capital LLC applied for and on August 16, 2021, was appointed Custodian of NASHVILLE RECORDS, INC. pursuant to NRS 78.347 ( Custodian Order ). COURT FURTHER FINDS after review that Alpharidge Capital LLC completed all their duties in accordance with the Custodian Order. THEREFORE COURT ORDERS for good cause appearing and after review that the Motion to Discharge is hereby GRANTED and the matter scheduled on March 23, 2023, on Motion Calendar is hereby VACATED. CLERK'S NOTE: This Minute Order was electronically served by Courtroom Clerk, Nicole McDevitt, to all registered parties for Odyssey File & Serve. /nm 3/22/2023 Judge: Allf, Nancy |
|
March 17, 2023 | Docket Event |
Audiovisual Transmission Equipment Appearance Request Doc ID# 20 [20] Notice of Intent to Appear by Simultaneous Audiovisual Transmission Equipment |
|
March 15, 2023 | Docket Event |
Motion Alpharidge Capital LLCs Motion to Discharge Custodianship and Enter Final Order Judge: Allf, Nancy |
|
February 10, 2023 | Docket Event |
Clerk's Notice of Hearing Doc ID# 19 [19] Notice of Hearing |
|
February 09, 2023 | Docket Event |
Motion Doc ID# 18 [18] Alpharidge Capital LLCs Motion to Discharge Custodianship and Enter Final Order |
|
February 03, 2023 | Docket Event |
Status Report Doc ID# 17 [17] Report of Alpharidge Capital LLC as Court Appointed Custodian of Nashville Records, Inc. |
|
October 18, 2022 | Docket Event |
Status Report Doc ID# 16 [16] Report of Alpharidge Capital LLC as Court Appointed Custodian of Nashville Records, Inc. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.