Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Pro Se filed a(n) Landlord-Tenant - Property case represented by Pro Se, against Hauser, Jennifer, in the jurisdiction of Clark County, NV, . Clark County, NV Superior Courts with Adriana Escobar presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeAdriana Escobar Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJuly 15, 2021 |
CategoryAppeal From Lower Court - Evictions/Tpo |
Last RefreshedNovember 06, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationClark County, NV |
Matter TypeLandlord-Tenant |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 27, 2023 | Docket Event |
Case Reassigned to Department 14 Pursuant to Administrative Order 23-01 - Reassigned to Judge Adriana Escobar |
|
July 20, 2021 | Docket Event |
Order to Statistically Close Case Doc ID# 2 [2] Civil Order to Statistically Close Case |
|
July 16, 2021 | Docket Event |
Minute Order The Court notes that, on July 15, 2021, the Roche Appellants filed a Civil Cover Sheet and a Notice of Appeal to District Court, initiating this Appeals case. In error, Appellants filed these documents with the District Court, rather than with the originating jurisdiction of the Eviction proceeding Las Vegas Justice Court. Accordingly, the Court STRIKES the filings as a rogue, DISMISSES the Appeal as erroneous, and directs the Clerk to CLOSE this matter and TRANSFER it back to the Justice Court; under case 21EH000343. CLERK'S NOTE: This Minute Order was electronically served by Courtroom Clerk, Valeria Guerra, to all registered parties for Odyssey File & Serve. - vg//7/16/2021 Judge: Eller, Crystal |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.