Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Porter Rockwell, Llc, filed a(n) Other Title To Property case represented by Joseph Y. Hong, against Deutsche Bank National Trust Company, represented by Jeffrey S. Allison, in the jurisdiction of Clark County, NV, . Clark County, NV Superior Courts with Johnson, Susan presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeJohnson, Susan Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJuly 14, 2021 |
CategoryOther Title To Property |
Last RefreshedAugust 19, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationClark County, NV |
|
Case Outcome TypeOrder Of Dismissal Without Prejudice |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 21, 2022 | Docket Event |
Order For Dismissal Without Prejudice Doc ID# 19 [19] Order for Dismissal Without Prejudice |
|
July 19, 2022 | Docket Event |
Show Cause Hearing Upon Court's inquiry, Mr. Hong stated, this case has settled, and he thought a Stipulation and Order for Dismissal was filed already; but he will file one if necessary. Pursuant to the representations of counsel, COURT ORDERED an Order for Voluntary Dismissal WILL ISSUE. Court to prepare the order. CLERK'S NOTE: This minute order was prepared by Courtroom Clerk via JAVS, Clara Jimenez./cj (07/20/22) Judge: Johnson, Susan |
|
July 12, 2022 | Docket Event |
Notice Doc ID# 18 [18] Notice of Department 22 Courtesy Copy & Appearance Instructions |
|
June 14, 2022 | Docket Event |
Order to Show Cause Doc ID# 17 [17] Order to Show Cause |
|
August 11, 2021 | Docket Event |
Declaration Doc ID# 14 [14] Notice and Declaration of Non-Monetary Status |
|
August 11, 2021 | Docket Event |
Initial Appearance Fee Disclosure Doc ID# 16 [16] Initial Appearance Fee Disclosure (NRS Chapter 19) |
|
August 11, 2021 | Docket Event |
Answer to Complaint Doc ID# 15 [15] Answer to Complaint |
|
August 05, 2021 | Docket Event |
Certificate of Service Doc ID# 13 [13] Certificate Of Service |
|
August 03, 2021 | Docket Event |
Notice of Entry Doc ID# 12 [12] Notice Of Entry Of Preliminary Injunction |
|
July 28, 2021 | Docket Event |
Order Doc ID# 11 [11] Preliminary Injunction |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.