Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
filed a(n) Other Civil Matters case in the jurisdiction of Clark County, NV, . Clark County, NV Superior Courts with Jones, David M presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeJones, David M Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJune 27, 2021 |
CategoryOther Civil Matters |
Last RefreshedNovember 18, 2021 |
|
Filing LocationClark County, NV |
|
Case Outcome TypeOrder Of Dismissal With Prejudice |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 17, 2021 | Docket Event |
Motion to Vacate Plaintiff's Motion to Vacate Dismissal Order and Notice of Motion Judge: Jones, David M |
|
October 20, 2021 | Docket Event |
Opposition to Motion Doc ID# 22 [22] Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion to Vacate Dismissal Order Pursuant to NRCP 60 |
|
October 13, 2021 | Docket Event |
Clerk's Notice of Hearing Doc ID# 21 [21] Notice of Hearing |
|
October 07, 2021 | Docket Event |
Motion to Vacate Doc ID# 20 [20] Motion to Vacate Dismissal Order and Notice of Motion |
|
October 07, 2021 | Docket Event |
Clerk's Notice of Nonconforming Document Doc ID# 19 [19] Clerk's Notice of Nonconforming Document |
|
October 06, 2021 | Docket Event |
Motion to Vacate Doc ID# 18 [18] Motion to Vacate Dismissal Order Pursuant to NRCP 60 |
|
October 06, 2021 | Docket Event |
Notice of Motion Doc ID# 17 [17] Notice of Motion |
|
September 23, 2021 | Docket Event |
Notice of Entry of Order Doc ID# 16 [16] Notice of Entry of Order Partially Granting Defendant's Motion to Dismiss and Remanding Case to Appropriate Lower Court |
|
September 23, 2021 | Docket Event |
Order Granting Motion Doc ID# 15 [15] Order Partially Granting Defendant's Motion to Dismiss and Remanding Case to Appropriate Lower Court |
|
September 02, 2021 | Docket Event |
Minute Order Order Partially Granting Motion to Dismiss After hearing oral arguments and reviewing all papers submitted, the COURT ORDERS the Motion to Dismiss filed 7/29/21 is PARTIALLY GRANTED. All claims except for the breach of contract claim are hereby DISMISSED. As this case now fails to meet the jurisdictional requirements to be heard by the district court, the COURT ORDERS this case to be REMANDED to the appropriate lower court. Defendant's counsel to prepare the order. CLERK'S NOTE: This Minute Order was electronically served to all registered parties for Odyssey File & Serve. /mt Judge: Jones, David M |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.