Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Ledezma, Sara, filed a(n) Compromise Of Minor'S Claim case against Galvan, Anthony A., in the jurisdiction of Clark County, NV, . Clark County, NV Superior Courts with Sturman, Gloria presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeSturman, Gloria Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJune 25, 2021 |
CategoryCompromise Of Minor'S Claim |
Last RefreshedAugust 19, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationClark County, NV |
|
Case Outcome TypeOrder Approving Minor'S Compromise |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 19, 2021 | Docket Event |
Proof of Blocked Account Doc ID# 4 [4] PROOF OF BLOCKED ACCOUNT |
|
August 27, 2021 | Docket Event |
Status Check: Blocked Account On Chambers calendar to review for proof of blocked account as proof no proof on file, this matter is continued to the Court's Chambers calendar. If no Proof of Account is on file, the Court will notice hearing to Show Cause why the matter should not be dismissed. CONTINUED TO: 9/24/21 Judge: Sturman, Gloria |
|
August 27, 2021 | Docket Event |
Status Check: Blocked Account
Judge: Sturman, Gloria |
|
July 07, 2021 | Docket Event |
Notice of Entry Doc ID# 3 [3] Notice of Entry |
|
June 29, 2021 | Docket Event |
Order Compromising Minors Claim Doc ID# 2 [2] Order Granting Petition for Compromise of Minor's Claim Regarding Aston Calvin Navarrette |
|
June 25, 2021 | Docket Event |
Petition for Compromise of Minors Claim Doc ID# 1 [1] Petition for Compromise of Minor's Claim |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.