Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
filed a(n) Other Civil Matters case in the jurisdiction of Clark County, NV, . Clark County, NV Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJune 10, 2021 |
CategoryOther Civil Matters |
Last RefreshedJune 22, 2021 |
|
Filing LocationClark County, NV |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 24, 2021 | Docket Event |
Motion for Appointment Application for Appointment of Custodian Judge: Eller, Crystal |
|
June 21, 2021 | Docket Event |
Minute Order The Court has concerns regarding Plaintiff's Application for Appointment of Custodian. Accordingly, the Court SETS a hearing on this matter for Thursday, June 24, 2021 at 10AM. All relevant parties are directed to appear. Further, 'in-person' appearances are now permitted. However, parties may still elect to appear remotely via Blue Jeans (information below). Phone #: 408.419.1715 Session ID: 583 879 418 https://bluejeans.com/583879418 CLERK'S NOTE: This Minute Order was e-filed and served to all registered parties and e-mailed to Defendant @eworldmsg@gmail.com. clm 6/21/21 Judge: Eller, Crystal |
|
June 15, 2021 | Docket Event | Order Shortening Time | |
June 15, 2021 | Docket Event | Notice of Entry of Order Shortening Time | |
June 14, 2021 | Docket Event |
Ex Parte Application Ex-Parte Application for Order Shortening Time |
|
June 11, 2021 | Docket Event |
Clerk's Notice of Hearing Notice of Hearing |
|
June 10, 2021 | Docket Event |
Complaint Application for Appointment of Custodian |
|
June 10, 2021 | Docket Event | Initial Appearance Fee Disclosure | |
June 10, 2021 | Docket Event |
Summons Electronically Issued - Service Pending Summons |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.