Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Cavalier Capital Holdings, Llc, Grose, Foster, filed a(n) Other Business Court Matters case represented by Jarrod L. Rickard, against Understein, Robert, represented by Cami M. Perkins, in the jurisdiction of Clark County, NV, . Clark County, NV Superior Courts with Allf, Nancy presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeAllf, Nancy Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJune 07, 2021 |
CategoryOther Business Court Matters |
Last RefreshedNovember 06, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationClark County, NV |
|
Case Outcome TypeOrder Of Dismissal Without Prejudice |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 10, 2023 | Docket Event |
Order to Statistically Close Case Doc ID# 41 [41] Civil Order to Statistically Close Case |
|
February 06, 2023 | Docket Event |
Bench Trial Vacated - per Stipulation and Order Judge: Allf, Nancy |
|
February 06, 2023 | Docket Event |
Bench Trial
Judge: Allf, Nancy |
|
January 26, 2023 | Docket Event |
Calendar Call Vacated - per Stipulation and Order Judge: Allf, Nancy |
|
January 26, 2023 | Docket Event |
Calendar Call
Judge: Allf, Nancy |
|
January 05, 2023 | Docket Event |
Status Check: Trial Readiness Vacated Judge: Allf, Nancy |
|
January 05, 2023 | Docket Event |
Status Check TRIAL READINESS Judge: Allf, Nancy |
|
December 16, 2022 | Docket Event |
Notice of Entry of Stipulation & Order for Dismissal Doc ID# 40 [40] NOTICE OF ENTRY OF STIPULATION AND ORDER TO DISMISS WITHOUT PREJUDICE |
|
December 15, 2022 | Docket Event |
Motion for Preliminary Injunction Plaintiff's Application for a Preliminary Injunction Appearances made via the BlueJeans Videoconferencing Application. Mr. Rickard stated he advised opposing counsel he would appear and notify the Court of the settlement and that there is a Stipulation to Dismiss in Court's inbox. COURT ORDERED, Plaintiff's Application for a Preliminary Injunction OFF CALENDAR. Judge: Allf, Nancy |
|
December 15, 2022 | Docket Event |
Order of Dismissal Without Prejudice Doc ID# 39 [39] Stipulation and Order to Dismiss Without Prejudice |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.