Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
filed a(n) Other Civil Filings (Petition) case in the jurisdiction of Clark County, NV, . Clark County, NV Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJune 04, 2021 |
CategoryOther Civil Filings (Petition) |
Last RefreshedNovember 09, 2021 |
|
Filing LocationClark County, NV |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 08, 2021 | Docket Event |
Minute Order Order Rescheduling Hearing For purposes of judicial economy, the hearing scheduled November 9, 2021, is hereby RESCHEDULED for November 17, 2021 at 9:00 AM. CLERK'S NOTE: This Minute Order was electronically served to all registered parties for Odyssey File & Serve. /mt Judge: Jones, David M |
|
October 26, 2021 | Docket Event |
Motion to Set Aside Court received the stipulation to continue the hearing and SIGNED the matter in OPEN COURT. CONTINUED TO: 11/9/21 9:00 AM Judge: Jones, David M |
|
October 26, 2021 | Docket Event |
Motion to Set Aside Respondent Entia Biosciences Inc.'s Motion to Set Aside Order Granting Application for the Appointment of Alpharidge Capital, LLC as Custodian of Entia Biosciences Inc. Pursuant to NRS 78.347 Judge: Jones, David M |
|
October 04, 2021 | Docket Event |
Non Opposition Doc ID# 18 [18] Non-Opposition to Motion to Vacate; Cross-Motion to Terminate Custodianship |
|
September 23, 2021 | Docket Event |
Motion to Set Aside Doc ID# 15 [15] Respondent Entia Biosciences Inc.'s Motion to Set Aside Order Granting Application for the Appointment of Alpharidge Capital, LLC as Custodian of Entia Biosciences Inc. Pursuant to NRS 78.347 |
|
September 23, 2021 | Docket Event |
Initial Appearance Fee Disclosure Doc ID# 16 [16] Initial Appearance Fee Disclosure (NRS Chapter 19) |
|
September 23, 2021 | Docket Event |
Clerk's Notice of Hearing Doc ID# 17 [17] Notice of Hearing |
|
September 14, 2021 | Docket Event |
Report and Recommendations Doc ID# 14 [14] Quarterly Report of Custodian |
|
June 22, 2021 | Docket Event |
Order Granting Doc ID# 12 [12] Order Granting Application for the Appointment of Alpharidge Capital LLC as Custodian of Entia Biosciences |
|
June 22, 2021 | Docket Event |
Notice of Entry of Order Doc ID# 13 [13] Notice of Entry of Order Granting Application for the Appointment of Custodian |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.