Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
filed a(n) Other Civil Filings (Petition) case in the jurisdiction of Clark County, NV, . Clark County, NV Superior Courts with Elizabeth Gonzalez presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeElizabeth Gonzalez Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJune 02, 2021 |
CategoryOther Civil Filings (Petition) |
Last RefreshedAugust 13, 2022 |
|
Filing LocationClark County, NV |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 12, 2022 | Docket Event |
All Pending Motions MOTION TO TERMINATE CUSTODIANSHIP ON ORDER SHORTENING TIME...MOTION Petitioner s Motion to Terminate Custodianship on Order Shortening Time came before the Court on its August 12, 2022 chambers calendar. The Court has reviewed the record and the pleadings, and finds that the custodian has satisfactorily completed its duties as required by NRS 178.347(3). Therefore, the Court hereby GRANTS the Motion. The actions of Acropolis Capital Partners in its capacity as custodian of Kasten, Inc. are APPROVED and the custodianship is TERMINATED. The August 26, 2022 Status Check is VACATED. Counsel is instructed to submit an order consistent with these minutes for the Court s signature. CLERK'S NOTE: This minute order was electronically served by Courtroom Clerk, Natalie Ortega, to all registered parties for Odyssey File & Serve and/or served via facsimile. ndo/08/12/22 Judge: Roohani, Ellie |
|
August 12, 2022 | Docket Event |
Hearing
Judge: Roohani, Ellie |
|
August 12, 2022 | Docket Event |
Motion to Terminate Custodianship on Order Shortening Time
Judge: Roohani, Ellie |
|
July 25, 2022 | Docket Event |
Order Shortening Time Doc ID# 20 [20] Motion to Terminate Custodianship on Order Shortening Time |
|
June 16, 2022 | Docket Event |
Notice of Entry of Order Doc ID# 19 [19] Notice of Entry of Order Granting Motion to Cancel Shares of Kasten Stock on Order Shortening Time |
|
May 12, 2022 | Docket Event |
Order Granting Motion Doc ID# 18 [18] Order Granting Motion to Cancel Shares of Kasten Stock on Order Shortening Time |
|
May 10, 2022 | Docket Event |
Motion OST on Cancellation of Shares Mr. Coppedge advised they tried to serve the party, the one who owns the shares, however, they could not serve him due to no address. The merger from which he was going to issue stocks for himself did not take place. Colloquy regarding the cancellation of shares. Court noted it find that he has been served and no appropriate way to serve him, it will WAIVE the right to that. COURT ORDERED, OST on Cancellation of Shares, GRANTED. Mr. Coppedge to prepare the order. Judge: Roohani, Ellie |
|
May 10, 2022 | Docket Event |
Motion OST on Cancellation of Shares Judge: Roohani, Ellie |
|
May 09, 2022 | Docket Event |
Declaration Doc ID# 17 [17] Declaration of Service of Order Granting Motion to Appoint Custodian and For Temporary Restraining Order on Order Shortening Time in Part; Automated Certificate of Service; Petition for Appointment of Custodian Pursuant to NRS 78.347 and for Injunctive Relief; Hearing Requested; Notice of Entry of Order |
|
April 25, 2022 | Docket Event |
Order Shortening Time Doc ID# 16 [16] Motion to Cancel Shares of Kasten Stock on Order Shortening Time |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.