Case Last Refreshed: 15 hours ago
Capfund Enterprises Inc, Sciara, Brian, filed a(n) Other Business Court Matters case represented by Robert A. Rabbat, against Micamp Holdings, Llc, Micamp Solutions, Llc, represented by Colin Cavanaugh, in the jurisdiction of Clark County, NV, . Clark County, NV Superior Courts with Johnson, Susan presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeJohnson, Susan Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateNovember 02, 2020 |
CategoryOther Business Court Matters |
Last RefreshedApril 18, 2024 |
|
Filing LocationClark County, NV |
|
Case Outcome TypeOrder Of Dismissal With Prejudice |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 08, 2024 | Docket Event |
Administrative Reassignment Pursuant to Administrative Order 23-05 |
|
August 14, 2023 | Docket Event |
Notice of Entry of Order Doc ID# 217 [217] Notice of Entry of Order Granting Motion to Withdraw |
|
August 04, 2023 | Docket Event |
Notice of Bankruptcy Doc ID# 216 [216] NOTICE OF FILING CHAPTER 11 BANKRUPTCY |
|
August 01, 2023 | Docket Event |
Writ of Execution Doc ID# 215 [215] Writ of Execution |
|
July 20, 2023 | Docket Event |
Notice Doc ID# 214 [214] Notice of Assignment |
|
July 18, 2023 | Docket Event |
Motion to Stay Plaintiffs Brian Sciara and Capfund Enterprises, Inc.'s Motion to Stay Enforcement of Judgment Pending Appeal Judge: Johnson, Susan |
|
July 12, 2023 | Docket Event |
Affidavit of Service Doc ID# 212 [212] Affidavit of Service |
|
July 12, 2023 | Docket Event |
Order Denying Doc ID# 211 [211] Order Denying Plaintiffs' Motion for Stay of Enforcement of Judgment Pending Appeal |
|
July 12, 2023 | Docket Event |
Notice of Entry of Order Doc ID# 213 [213] Notice of Entry of Order Denying Plaintiffs' Motion for Stay of Enforcement of Judgment Pending Appeal |
|
July 12, 2023 | Docket Event |
Order Denying Doc ID# 211 [211] Order Denying Motion for Stay of Enforcement of Judgment Pending Appeal[30083892v1] |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.